Norient Product Pool A/S et al v. NuStar Energy Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Norient Product Pool A/S and Ridgebury Echo, LLC
Defendant: NuStar Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00184
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Resetting as to #4 Order for Initial Conference - FORM. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (wbostic, 4)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by NuStar Energy Services, Inc., filed.(Gallant, Walter)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NuStar Energy Services, Inc., filed.(Gallant, Walter)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to NuStar Energy Services, Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019, filed.(Barr, Eugene)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene W. Barr on behalf of Norient Product Pool A/S, Ridgebury Echo, LLC, filed. (Barr, Eugene)
June 4, 2019 Summons Issued as to NuStar Energy Services, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to NuStar Energy Services, Inc., filed.(Walker, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NuStar Energy Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22544012) filed by Norient Product Pool A/S, Ridgebury Echo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norient Product Pool A/S et al v. NuStar Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NuStar Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Walter Joseph Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norient Product Pool A/S
Represented By: David R Walker
Represented By: Eugene Wade Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ridgebury Echo, LLC
Represented By: David R Walker
Represented By: Eugene Wade Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?