Atencio v. Port America
Plaintiff: Norberto Atencio
Defendant: Port America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00197
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Resetting as to #3 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (dwilkerson, 3)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Invoke by Norberto Atencio, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2019. (agould, 3)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO #4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by Norberto Atencio. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
June 17, 2019 (PER INSTRUCTIONS FROM THE COURT )Summons were retrieved from USMS prior to being served. SUMMONS NOT SERVED) Summons Re-Issued Complaint/supplement/orders as to Port America and hand delivered to USMS for service, filed.(ltrevino, 3)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/1/2019(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
June 14, 2019 (Disregard Summons re-issued)Summons Issued as to Port America. Hand delivered to USMS per order of the court., filed.(ltrevino, 3) Modified on 6/17/2019 (ltrevino, 3).
June 14, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to Norberto Atencio due to these deficiencies: Name/Address of Plaintiff Attorney or Plaintff and Defendant not present. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by Phone, filed.(ltrevino, 3)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Port America filed by Norberto Atencio Application to Proceed IFP Granted on 6/14/19.(ltrevino, 3). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2019: #1 Summons) (ltrevino, 3). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #2 Supplement) (ltrevino, 3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atencio v. Port America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norberto Atencio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?