Hitchcock Independent School District v. Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London et al
Plaintiff: Hitchcock Independent School District
Defendant: Taun Pareek, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, Lexington Insurance Company, Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company and Tom McCartney
Case Number: 3:2019cv00198
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Minute entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison. Pre-Motion Conference held on August 15, 2019 as to [Dkt. 12] Request for pre-motion conference. Plaintiff will file the motion to remand by next Wednesday, August 21, 2019. Defendant will file a response by Wednesday, September 11, 2019. Plaintiff may file a reply by September 25, 2019. Defendant is allowed to file a motion to compel arbitration without the need to file a pre-motion letter. Such a motion should be filed by Wednesday, August 21, 2019. Plaintiff's response is due September 11, 2019. Defendant may file a reply by September 25, 2019. The Court would appreciate, if possible, the parties to provide the reply briefs by Wednesday, September 18. Appearances: April Rosenbaum for the plaintiff and Raymond Gregory, II and John Raborn for the defendants. (ERO:Yes), filed. (wbostic, 4)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand by Hitchcock Independent School District, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Dec Page)(Hodge, Shaun)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Setting as to #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (wbostic, 4)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Andrew Edison re #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed. (SusanGram, 3)
August 7, 2019 Pre-motion conference scheduled for August 7, 2019 (Dkt #15 ) cancelled, filed. (SusanGram, 3)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY in Support of #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed by Hitchcock Independent School District. (Hodge, Shaun)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Setting as to #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, #14 Response. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 02:45 PM by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (jegonzalez, 3)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference , filed on behalf of all Defendants, filed by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London. (Gregory, Raymond)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Resetting as to #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (dwilkerson, 3)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Hodge, Shaun)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER striking #10 Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 ***STRICKEN*** MOTION to Remand by Hitchcock Independent School District, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Dec Page)(Hodge, Shaun) Modified on 7/17/2019 (agould, 3).
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hitchcock Independent School District, filed.(Hodge, Shaun)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED ANSWER to by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Lexington Insurance Company, Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, filed. (Gregory, Raymond)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Lexington Insurance Company, Tom McCartney, Taun Pareek, Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Gregory, Raymond)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Taun Pareek, filed.(Gregory, Raymond)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Tom McCartney, filed.(Gregory, Raymond)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Lexington Insurance Company, Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Gregory, Raymond)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Lexington Insurance Company, Tom McCartney, Taun Pareek, filed.(Gregory, Raymond)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 405th Judicial District Court of Galveston County, case number 19-CV-0928 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22622129) filed by International Insurance Company of Hannover, Tom McCartney, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Taun Pareek, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Tab 1 - Executed Process, #3 Exhibit Tab 2 - Pleadings on File, #4 Exhibit Tab 4 - Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Tab 5 - Index of Matter, #6 Exhibit Tab 6 - List of Counsel)(Gregory, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitchcock Independent School District v. Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taun Pareek
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Represented By: William J Eggleston
Represented By: John Michael Raborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Insurance Company of Hannover
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Represented By: William J Eggleston
Represented By: John Michael Raborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Represented By: William J Eggleston
Represented By: John Michael Raborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Represented By: William J Eggleston
Represented By: John Michael Raborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Represented By: William J Eggleston
Represented By: John Michael Raborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Represented By: William J Eggleston
Represented By: John Michael Raborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Represented By: William J Eggleston
Represented By: John Michael Raborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Represented By: William J Eggleston
Represented By: John Michael Raborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Represented By: William J Eggleston
Represented By: John Michael Raborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Represented By: William J Eggleston
Represented By: John Michael Raborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom McCartney
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Represented By: William J Eggleston
Represented By: John Michael Raborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hitchcock Independent School District
Represented By: Shaun Wesley Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?