Pines v. General Motors LLC

Plaintiff: Linda J Pines
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00227
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by General Motors LLC, filed.(Cox, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC, filed.(Cox, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Linda J Pines, filed.(Mitchell, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to General Motors LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019, filed.(Mitchell, James)
July 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to General Motors LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to General Motors LLC, filed.(Mitchell, James)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22745775) filed by Linda J Pines. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pines v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda J Pines
Represented By: James L Mitchell
Represented By: Charles F Herd, Jr
Represented By: Andrew S. Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey J Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?