Marsh v. BP Products North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harry F Marsh
Defendant: Keystone Shipping Co., Farrell Lines, Inc, Trinidad Corporation, ConocoPhillips Company, Chas. Kurz & Co., Inc., Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Texaco, Inc., National Bulk Carriers, Inc. and BP Products North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00242
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 42:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Compliant by National Bulk Carriers, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Mark)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ConocoPhillips Company served on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Jeffrey V Brown, pursuant to General Order No. 2019-8. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect Judge George C Hanks, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to National Bulk Carriers, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Trinidad Corporation served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Keystone Shipping Co. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Farrell Lines, Inc served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Chas. Kurz & Co., Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Chevron U.S.A. Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to BP Products North America, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Harry F Marsh, filed.(Clark, Meredith)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge George C Hanks, Jr. Judge Vanessa D Gilmore no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (bthomas, 4)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Vanessa D Gilmore recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22849758) filed by Harry F Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case-Specific Exhibit List, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: BP Products North America, Inc., #4 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Chas. Kurz & Co., Inc., #5 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Chevron U.S.A. Inc., #6 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: ConocoPhillips Company, #7 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Farrell Lines, Inc., #8 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Keystone Shipping Co., #9 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: National Bulk Carriers, Inc., #10 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Texaco, Inc., #11 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Trinidad Corporation)(Clark, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marsh v. BP Products North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Shipping Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farrell Lines, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinidad Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chas. Kurz & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Bulk Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry F Marsh
Represented By: Meredith Kay Clark
Represented By: Timothy Alan Swafford
Represented By: John Eugene Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?