U.S. Bank N.A. v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Defendant: Deborah J Lee and Elton M Lee
Case Number: 3:2019cv00290
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Jeffrey V Brown, pursuant to General Order No. 2019-8. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect Judge George C Hanks, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Elton M Lee served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019, filed.(Hessami, Samin)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
August 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to Deborah J Lee, Elton M Lee. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Deborah J Lee, Elton M Lee, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by U.S. Bank N.A., filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deborah J Lee, Elton M Lee (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23017203) filed by U.S. Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank N.A. v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah J Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elton M Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Samin Hessami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?