Parrott Jr. v. Sizemore et al

Plaintiff: Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr.
Defendant: Creed Lake Paris and Ronald Wayne Lindsey
Case Number: 3:2019cv00291
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
August 23, 2019 *** Petitioner's address updated, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
August 23, 2019 Filing 33 Case transferred in from Texas Eastern. Case Number 6:19-cv-00214; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF PARTIAL TRANSFER TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS: ORDERED that the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendants Dr. Paris and Dr. Lindsey are SEVERED from this lawsuit and TRANSFERRED forthwith to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Galveston Division, for such other and further proceedings as that court may deem appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/20/2019. (mjc, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 31 INITIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #14 Amended Complaint filed by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr., recommending that the Plaintiff's federal law claims against the Defendant Dennis Crowley be dismissed with prejudice for purposes of proceeding in forma pauperis as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/20/2019. (mjc, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Initial Partial Filing Fee and Collection Order: The motion to proceed ifp #15 is granted. No initial partial filing fee is assessed, but Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 balance in installments. The agency having custody of the Plaintiff shall deduct 20% of each deposit made to the Plaintiff's inmate trust account and forward payments to the Court on a regular basis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/20/2019. (mjc, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File a second amended complaint. Because the amended complaint drops the University of Texas Medical Branch, the Powledge Unit Medical Department, and the Stiles Unit Medical Department, the Clerk shall terminate these entities as defendants in the case. The lawsuit shall be re-styled as Parrott v. Sizemore, et al. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/20/2019. (mjc, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to reverse transfer order re #23 Order, to grant ifp and to have the U.S. Marshal serve summons by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. (mjc, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE/OBJECTION to #23 Order, by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. (mjc, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE/OBJECTION to #23 Order, by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. (mjc, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #1 Exhibit - Medical Board Letter) (mjc, ).
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 Letter from Jimmie Mark Parrott. (mjc, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. on 8/2/2019 as to #23 Order. (gsg)
July 26, 2019 Claims arising from the Beaumont Division have been severed and transferred to that division per Order #23 , their case no. 1:19cv320. (mjc, )
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that the Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Mr. DeLeon, as well as any other claims which may have arisen at the Stiles Unit, are SEVERED from this lawsuit and TRANSFERRED forthwith to the Beaumont Division for such other and further proceedings as that court may deem appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/25/2019. (mjc, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of filing letter/complaint to Dr. Deleon by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. (mjc, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(mjc, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 Sealed Document - submission of medical records. (mjc, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr.. (mjc, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr.. (mjc, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr.. (mjc, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Jimmie Parrott regarding hearing. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (gsg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with data sheet by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. (mjc, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dennis Crowley, FNU DeLeon, Ronald Wayne Lindsey, Creed Lake Paris, Michael Sizemore, filed by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibits)(mjc, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of submission of exhibits by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mjc, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr.. (mjc, )
June 24, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. in Amended Complaint #11 . (mjc, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe(Hospital Administrator, John Sealy Hospital), John Doe(Dean of UTMB), Ronald Wayne Lindsey, Creed Lake Paris, filed by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr.(mjc, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. on 6/20/2019 as to #8 Order, #7 Order, 1983 form, and ifp form. (mjc, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from Jimmie Parrott (mailed requested docket sheet and Gen Ord 15-13) (tkd, )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of receipt of this order in which to either: (1) pay the statutory $400.00 filing fee, or (2) furnish an IFP application with a certified IFP data sheet or inmate account summary sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/11/2019. (gsg)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of receipt of this order in which to file an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/11/2019. (gsg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Medical Records. (mjc, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. (mjc, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. (mjc, )
May 14, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. Consent form mailed to Plaintiff. (mjc, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mjc, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Powledge Unit Medical Department, Stiles Unit Medical Department, University of Texas Medical Branch, filed by Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr. (mjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrott Jr. v. Sizemore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Mark Parrott Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creed Lake Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Wayne Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?