Alliant Credit Union v. NEESE et al
Plaintiff: Alliant Credit Union
Defendant: SAMUEL T. NEESE, M/Y CHEROKEE LADY, a 1990 Hatteras 74-foot motor yacht, Official No. 965837, its Engines, Tackle, Machinery, Furniture, Apparel, Appurtenances, Etc., DOES Nos. 1-10, M/Y Cherokee Lady and Samuel T Neese
Case Number: 3:2019cv00293
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:741
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 28 Amended MOTION for Entry of Default against All Defendants by Alliant Credit Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Max Kelley, #2 Proposed Order Granting Entry of Default, #3 Certificate of Service)(Kelley, Max) Modified on 10/24/2019 (dwilkerson, 3).
October 22, 2019 Filing 27 REQUEST for Entry of Default against All Defendants by Alliant Credit Union, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Max Kelley, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kelley, Max)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 AMENDED ORDER OF PUBLIC NOTICE OF ACTION AND ARREST.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Substitute.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
October 9, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #20 MOTION For Public Notice of Action and Arrest, #22 MOTION to Amend #21 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Alliant Credit Union, filed.(Kelley, Max)
October 7, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Substitute Attorney-in-Charge by Alliant Credit Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Andrew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Amend #21 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Alliant Credit Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Max Kelley, #2 Proposed Order)(Kelley, Max)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion ORDER OF PUBLIC NOTICE OF ACTION AND ARREST.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION For Public Notice of Action and Arrest by Alliant Credit Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelley, Max)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Jeffrey V Brown, pursuant to General Order No. 2019-8. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect Judge George C Hanks, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4)
September 5, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Samuel T Neese served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019, filed.(agould, 3)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of Service Executed as to Smauel T. Neese, In Personam; the vessel CHEROKEE LADY on 8/27/19 re: Arrest of Vessel, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Stipulation re: Removal of Personal Items from Vessel M/V Cherokee Lady. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION re: Removal of Personal Items From the Def Vessel by Alliant Credit Union, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting the Removal)(Rodriguez, Ivan)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Max L Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Marc T Cefalu to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appoint.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 WARRANT to Seize a Vessel issued ( Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison), filed.(agould, 3)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to M/Y CHEROKEE LADY, a 1990 Hatteras 74-foot motor yacht, Official No. 965837, its Engines, Tackle, Machinery, Furniture, Apparel, Appurtenances, Etc., SAMUEL T. NEESE. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION for Marc T. Cefalu to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alliant Credit Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2019. (Rodriguez, Ivan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Max L. Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alliant Credit Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2019. (Rodriguez, Ivan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alliant Credit Union, filed.(Rodriguez, Ivan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by Alliant Credit Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Ivan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Issuance of Warrant by Alliant Credit Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order Warrant)(Rodriguez, Ivan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to M/Y CHEROKEE LADY, a 1990 Hatteras 74-foot motor yacht, Official No. 965837, its Engines, Tackle, Machinery, Furniture, Apparel, Appurtenances, Etc., SAMUEL T. NEESE, filed.(Rodriguez, Ivan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/Y CHEROKEE LADY, a 1990 Hatteras 74-foot motor yacht, Official No. 965837, its Engines, Tackle, Machinery, Furniture, Apparel, Appurtenances, Etc., SAMUEL T. NEESE, DOES Nos. 1-10 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23055449) filed by Alliant Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 Ship Mortgage, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliant Credit Union v. NEESE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL T. NEESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y CHEROKEE LADY, a 1990 Hatteras 74-foot motor yacht, Official No. 965837, its Engines, Tackle, Machinery, Furniture, Apparel, Appurtenances, Etc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES Nos. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y Cherokee Lady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel T Neese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliant Credit Union
Represented By: Ivan M Rodriguez
Represented By: Max L Kelley
Represented By: Marc T Cefalu
Represented By: Andrew Robert Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?