United States of America v. $532,812.83 U.S. Currency Seized From Sun Trust Account 5018
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $532,812.83 U.S. Currency Seized From Sun Trust Account 5018
Case Number: 3:2019cv00328
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service Executed as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security USSS on October 28, 2019 re: Warrant of Arrest in Rem, filed.(Rollinson, Kristine)
October 22, 2019 Warrant of Arrest In Rem issued, filed.(jdav, 4)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem by United States Of America, filed.(Rollinson, Kristine)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States Of America, filed.(Rollinson, Kristine)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $532,812.83 U.S. Currency Seized From Sun Trust Account 5018 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Rollinson, Kristine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $532,812.83 U.S. Currency Seized From Sun Trust Account 5018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $532,812.83 U.S. Currency Seized From Sun Trust Account 5018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kristine E Rollinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?