Kennemer v. Collier et al
Plaintiff: John David Kennemer
Defendant: A. Chevallier and Bryan Collier
Case Number: 3:2019cv00335
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Case transferred in from Houston Division Division on 10/09/2019 ; Case Number 4:19-cv-3879. Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey V Brown. filed by John David Kennemer.(rguerrero, 4)
October 9, 2019 Intradistrict Transfer to Galveston Division, filed. (rguerrero, 4)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Galveston Division (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (dwilkerson, 3)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER re application to proceed without prepaying costs re: #1 Complaint, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by John David Kennemer.(dwilkerson, 3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #1 Exhibit F) (MelissaMorgan, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennemer v. Collier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Chevallier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Kennemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?