Burns v. City of Santa Fe, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Damon Burns
Defendant: James Weiland Sergeant and City of Santa Fe, Texas
Case Number: 3:2019cv00338
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Santa Fe, Texas, and Sergeant James Weiland filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Giles, Norman)
November 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison on November 13, 2019. Pre-Motion Conference held as to [Dkt. 15] Request for Pre-Motion Conference. The Court made the following rulings: Defendant, James Weiland Sergeant will file a Motion to Dismiss by Friday, November 22, 2019. The Court gives permission to The City of Santa Fe to file a Motion to Dismiss, and that motion must also be filed by November 22, 2019. Responses to Defendants motions to dismiss will be due by December 13, 2019. A reply in support of both motions to dismiss will be due by December 20, 2019. Appearances: Norman Ray Giles for defendants City of Santa Fe, Texas and James Weiland Sergeant. (ERO:Yes), filed. (wbostic, 4)
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Setting as to #15 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 01:00 PM in by telephone before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (wbostic, 4)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleadings. Defendants must file their responsive pleadings by November 29, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Andrew Edison re #15 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to extend the deadline to serve and file responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed. (GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Giles, Norman)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to extend the deadline to serve and file responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Santa Fe, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2019. (Giles, Norman)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER striking #10 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by City of Santa Fe, Texas, filed.(Giles, Norman)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by City of Santa Fe, Texas, filed.(Giles, Norman)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Failure to State a Claim for Relief by City of Santa Fe, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Giles, Norman)
October 26, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Damon Burns, filed.(LaValle, Paul)
October 10, 2019 Case transferred in from Houston Division on 10/10/2019 ; Case Number 4:19-cv-3878 filed by Damon Burns.(rguerrero, 4)
October 10, 2019 Intradistrict Transfer to Galveston, filed. (rguerrero, 4)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Galveston Division (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to James Weiland Sergeant served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019, filed.(LaValle, Paul)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to City of Santa Fe, Texas served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019, filed.(LaValle, Paul)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(olindoradi, 4)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Santa Fe, Texas, James Weiland Sergeant. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Damon Burns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LaValle, Paul)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LaValle, Paul)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23320942) filed by Damon Burns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LaValle, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. City of Santa Fe, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Burns
Represented By: Paul Houston LaValle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Weiland Sergeant
Represented By: William Scott Helfand
Represented By: Norman Ray Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Fe, Texas
Represented By: William Scott Helfand
Represented By: Norman Ray Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?