Donald v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Donald, Jr.
Defendant: Lawrence Brown, Felipe Gonzalez, Anthony Patrick, Jr., Jacqueline Williams, Brodgrick C. Price, Cynthia Lowry and Demangella Thibeaux
Case Number: 3:2019cv00343
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Jimmy Donald, Jr re: #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed. (hlerma, 4)Re-noticed to new address.
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jimmy Donald, Jr, (document sent: docket sheet)., filed. (agould, 3)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Jimmy Donald, Jr., filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Production of Documents from Defendants by Jimmy Donald, Jr, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/15/2019) (JessicaVillarreal, 3).
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jimmy Donald, Jr, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jimmy Donald, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/5/2019. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #1 Complaint by Jimmy Donald, Jr, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Jimmy Donald, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibits, #3 Letter & Envelope)(JessicaVillarreal, 3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Patrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brodgrick C. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demangella Thibeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Donald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?