In the Matter of FPG Shipholding Panama 47 S.A., et al Do not docket in this case. Case is consolidated with 3:19-cv-207
Defendant: Liability
Petitioner: In the Matter of the Complaint of FPG Shipholding Panama 47 S.A., Ship No. 138 Co. Ltd., Ship No., 139 Co. Ltd., Genesis River Shipping, S.A., and K Line Energy Ship Management Co. Ltd., as Owner and, K Line Energy Ship Management, Ship No. 138 Co Ltd., Genesis River Shipping, S.A., Ship No. 139 Co. Ltd. and FPG Shipholding Panama 47 S.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00372
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. (THIS ORDER IS DOCKETED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES) (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED INITIAL ORDER on Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability entered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) (Attachments: #1 AMENDED Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Order on Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Andrew Edison re #2 MOTION for Order Approving Issuance of Monition to Claimants, Restraining Prosecution of Claims, Order of Entry of Stipulation for Value and Tender of Costs in Lieu of Bond, filed. (GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene W. Barr on behalf of In the Matter of the Complaint of FPG Shipholding Panama 47 S.A., Ship No. 138 Co. Ltd., Ship No., 139 Co. Ltd., Genesis River Shipping, S.A., and K Line Energy Ship Management Co. Ltd., as Owner and, filed. (Barr, Eugene)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. Walters on behalf of In the Matter of the Complaint of FPG Shipholding Panama 47 S.A., Ship No. 138 Co. Ltd., Ship No., 139 Co. Ltd., Genesis River Shipping, S.A., and K Line Energy Ship Management Co. Ltd., as Owner and, filed. (Walters, Kevin)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by In the Matter of the Complaint of FPG Shipholding Panama 47 S.A., Ship No. 138 Co. Ltd., Ship No., 139 Co. Ltd., Genesis River Shipping, S.A., and K Line Energy Ship Management Co. Ltd., as Owner and, filed.(Georgantas, Dimitri)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order Approving Issuance of Monition to Claimants, Restraining Prosecution of Claims, Order of Entry of Stipulation for Value and Tender of Costs in Lieu of Bond by In the Matter of the Complaint of FPG Shipholding Panama 47 S.A., Ship No. 138 Co. Ltd., Ship No., 139 Co. Ltd., Genesis River Shipping, S.A., and K Line Energy Ship Management Co. Ltd., as Owner and, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A to Initial Order)(Georgantas, Dimitri)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liability (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23526886) filed by In the Matter of the Complaint of FPG Shipholding Panama 47 S.A., Ship No. 138 Co. Ltd., Ship No., 139 Co. Ltd., Genesis River Shipping, S.A., and K Line Energy Ship Management Co. Ltd., as Owner and. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unsworn Declaration)(Georgantas, Dimitri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of FPG Shipholding Panama 47 S.A., et al Do not docket in this case. Case is consolidated with 3:19-cv-207
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In the Matter of the Complaint of FPG Shipholding Panama 47 S.A., Ship No. 138 Co. Ltd., Ship No., 139 Co. Ltd., Genesis River Shipping, S.A., and K Line Energy Ship Management Co. Ltd., as Owner and
Represented By: Eugene Wade Barr
Represented By: Dimitri P Georgantas
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: K Line Energy Ship Management
Represented By: Eugene Wade Barr
Represented By: Dimitri P Georgantas
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ship No. 138 Co Ltd.
Represented By: Eugene Wade Barr
Represented By: Dimitri P Georgantas
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Genesis River Shipping, S.A.
Represented By: Eugene Wade Barr
Represented By: Dimitri P Georgantas
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ship No. 139 Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Eugene Wade Barr
Represented By: Dimitri P Georgantas
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FPG Shipholding Panama 47 S.A.
Represented By: Eugene Wade Barr
Represented By: Dimitri P Georgantas
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liability
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?