Jennings et al v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Ennis Jackson, Henry Jennings, Frank Finaley, Ali Chammod, Malachi Muhammad, Candy Hughes, Justin Hubert, Allen Jones, Jimmy Donald, Jr., Earest Fontenot and Robert Hicks
Defendant: Brodgrick Price, Cynthia Lowry, Lawrence Brown, Anthony Patrick, Jr., Felipe Gonzalez, Demangella Thibeaux and Jacqueline Williams
Case Number: 3:2019cv00385
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 Statement of Facts by Candy Hughes, filed.(agould, 3)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable marked as Unable to Forward as to Jimmy Donald, Jr re: #11 Order for Service on TX Attorney General,, filed. No other address available. (rguerrero, 4)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Jennings motion to proceed IFP #4 Dismissing all plaintiffs other than Jennings without prejudice, denying Jennings motion for production of documents #7 and denying Jennings request for appointment of counsel #6 . (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3) Modified on 12/20/2019 (bgoolsby, 4).
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Henry Jennings re: Non-consent to Magistrate, filed. (dwilkerson, 3)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned Refused as to Jimmy Donald, Jr re: #8 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening, inmate not found on TDCJ website, filed. (JenniferLongoria, 1)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Ali Chammod, Jimmy Donald, Jr, Frank Finaley, Earest Fontenot, Robert Hicks, Justin Hubert, Candy Hughes, Ennis Jackson, Henry Jennings, Allen Jones, Malachi Muhammad, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Ali Chammod, Jimmy Donald, Jr, Frank Finaley, Earest Fontenot, Robert Hicks, Justin Hubert, Candy Hughes, Ennis Jackson, Henry Jennings, Allen Jones, Malachi Muhammad, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/9/2019. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ali Chammod, Jimmy Donald, Jr, Frank Finaley, Earest Fontenot, Robert Hicks, Justin Hubert, Candy Hughes, Ennis Jackson, Henry Jennings, Allen Jones, Malachi Muhammad, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ali Chammod, Jimmy Donald, Jr, Frank Finaley, Earest Fontenot, Robert Hicks, Justin Hubert, Candy Hughes, Ennis Jackson, Henry Jennings, Allen Jones, Malachi Muhammad, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/9/2019. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Henry Jennings, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of re: #1 Complaint, by Ali Chammod, Jimmy Donald, Jr, Frank Finaley, Earest Fontenot, Felipe Gonzalez, Robert Hicks, Justin Hubert, Candy Hughes, Ennis Jackson, Henry Jennings, Allen Jones, Malachi Muhammad, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Ali Chammod, Justin Hubert, Jimmy Donald, Jr, Henry Jennings, Malachi Muhammad, Frank Finaley, Ennis Jackson, Earest Fontenot, Robert Hicks, Allen Jones, Candy Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JessicaVillarreal, 3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings et al v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ennis Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Finaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Chammod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malachi Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Hubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Donald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earest Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brodgrick Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Patrick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demangella Thibeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?