ABS-CBN Corporation et al v. Brown
Plaintiff: ABS-CBN International, ABS-CBN Corporation and ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Anthony Brown, Life for Greatness, Ann Ong and Tony Brown
Case Number: 3:2019cv00397
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0521
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International, filed.(Abbott, Steven)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Anthony Brown served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Abbott, Steven)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 APPENDIX re: #6 MOTION for Substituted Service and Memorandum of Law in Support by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A: Declaration of Eric Johnson, #2 Exhibit Ex. B: Declaration of Kevin Reyes, #3 Exhibit Ex. C: Declaration of Joel Voyles)(Abbott, Steven)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Substituted Service and Memorandum of Law in Support by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abbott, Steven)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Anthony Brown. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(dwilkerson, 3)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Anthony Brown, filed.(Abbott, Steven)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International identifying Plaintiff ABS-CBN Corporation as the corporate parent of Plaintiffs ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc. and ABS-CBN International. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Abbott, Steven)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Brown (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23706640) filed by ABS-CBN Corporation, ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc., ABS-CBN International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1: Certificates of Registration for the ABS-CBN Registered Marks, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2: Examples of Defendant's Use of the ABS-CBN Marks, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abbott, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABS-CBN Corporation et al v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life for Greatness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABS-CBN International
Represented By: Steven Michael Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABS-CBN Corporation
Represented By: Steven Michael Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABS-CBN Film Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Michael Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?