163, LLC v. Darling, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: 163, LLC
Defendant: Robert Darling, Jr. and Christina Fok
Case Number: 3:2020cv00054
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL #12 MOTION for More Definite Statement. Case terminated on 3/26/2020 (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Defendants by 163, LLC, filed. (Stewart, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Christina Fok, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2020. (Watkins, Bruce)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 3/25/2020..(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer by Robert Darling, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGarvey, Cassandra)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER striking #8 Motion for More Definite Statement.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Christina Fok, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Watkins, Bruce)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by 163, LLC, filed.(Stewart, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Christina Fok served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020, filed.(Stewart, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Robert Darling, Jr. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020, filed.(Stewart, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Robert Darling, Jr., Christina Fok. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(dwilkerson, 3)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Stewart, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Darling, Jr. and Christina Fok(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24211874) filed by 163, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B")(Stewart, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 163, LLC v. Darling, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 163, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Dale Stewart
Represented By: James E Cuellar
Represented By: Douglas Brent Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Darling, Jr.
Represented By: Cassandra Marie McGarvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Fok
Represented By: Bruce Kirby Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?