Burton v. Coastal Health & Wellness et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Burton
Defendant: Coastal Health & Wellness and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2020cv00059
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Redlinger, Julie)
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Redlinger, Julie)
April 9, 2020 ***Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 5/4/2020. (agould, 3)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Timothy Burton, filed.(Greenlee, Scott)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 3/4/2020, answer due 5/4/2020, filed.(Greenlee, Scott)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 3/5/2020, answer due 5/4/2020, filed.(Greenlee, Scott)
February 28, 2020 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(agould, 3)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Greenlee, Scott)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24274677) filed by Timothy Burton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greenlee, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Coastal Health & Wellness et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Health & Wellness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Julie Margaret Redlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Burton
Represented By: Scott C Greenlee
Represented By: Shawn Paul Fox
Represented By: Sean Patrick Tracey
Represented By: Lance Nolan Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?