Flocon Products, Inc. v. FloconX LLC
Plaintiff: Flocon Products, Inc.
Defendant: FloconX LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00242
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 10/14/2020. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Flocon Products, Inc., filed.(Joseph, Terry)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (agould, 3)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24941919) filed by Flocon Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiffs Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Joseph, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flocon Products, Inc. v. FloconX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FloconX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flocon Products, Inc.
Represented By: Terry Blaine Joseph
Represented By: David Martin Lodholz
Represented By: John Davis Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?