Hammond v. Dow Chemical Company
Plaintiff: Dillon Hammond
Defendant: DOW Chemical Company and The Dow Chemical Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00259
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dillon Hammond, filed.(Harris, Paul)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Margaret C. Stalker to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Amanda M. Fielder to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Edward j. Bardelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION MOTION IN SUPPORT OF MARGARET C. STALKERS MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by The Dow Chemical Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/27/2020. (Jones, Sarah)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION MOTION IN SUPPORT OF AMANDA M. FIELDERS MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by The Dow Chemical Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/27/2020. (Jones, Sarah)
October 6, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION Motion in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward Bardelli by The Dow Chemical Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/27/2020. (Jones, Sarah)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Margaret C. Stalker to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Dow Chemical Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/27/2020. (Jones, Sarah)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Amanda M. Fielder to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Dow Chemical Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/27/2020. (Jones, Sarah)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Edward J. Bardelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Dow Chemical Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/27/2020. (Jones, Sarah)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Dow Chemical Company, filed.(Jones, Sarah)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by The Dow Chemical Company, filed.(Jones, Sarah)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to The Dow Chemical Company served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020, filed.(Lazarz, Mark)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Dow Chemical Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Dow Chemical Company, filed.(Lazarz, Mark)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOW Chemical Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25037596) filed by Dillon Hammond.(Harris, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammond v. Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOW Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Amanda May Fielder
Represented By: Edward J. Bardelli
Represented By: Sarah Clinton Jones
Represented By: Margaret C Stalker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dillon Hammond
Represented By: Paul Robert Harris
Represented By: Mark G. Lazarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?