Gomez v. Clear Blue Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sonia Gomez
Defendant: Clear Blue Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00335
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Clear Blue Insurance Company, filed. (Thompson, Rhonda)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 1/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment by Clear Blue Insurance Company, filed. (Thompson, Rhonda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Clear Blue Insurance Company, filed.(Thompson, Rhonda)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sonia Gomez, filed.(Corona, Jesse)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for First-Party Insurance Property Damage Cases Arising from Disasters.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Clear Blue Insurance Company, filed.(Thompson, Rhonda)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Sonia Gomez (Filing fee $400, receipt number HOU098471) filed by Clear Blue Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Rhonda) Payment information added on 10/28/2020 (ltien, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Clear Blue Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Gomez
Represented By: Jesse S. Corona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Blue Insurance Company
Represented By: Rhonda J Thompson
Represented By: Victoria Leigh Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?