G & H Diversified Manufacturing, LP v. DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH et al
Plaintiff: G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LP
Defendant: DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH and DynaEnergetics US, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00376
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Wyde on behalf of G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LP, filed. (Wyde, Joshua)
February 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 3/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
February 4, 2021 Filing 13 ***Docketed In Error*** (JessicaVillarreal, 3).
February 4, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, Megan)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to DynaEnergetics US, Inc. served on 1/15/2021, answer due 2/5/2021, filed.(Alavi, Amir)
January 18, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 Request for Issuance of Summons as to DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, filed.(Alavi, Amir)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to DynaEnergetics US, Inc. c/o National Registered Agents, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed.(Alavi, Amir)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LP, filed.(Alavi, Amir)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (agould, 3)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to DynaEnergetics US, Inc., filed.(Alavi, Amir)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25663814) filed by G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Alavi, Amir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & H Diversified Manufacturing, LP v. DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LP
Represented By: Amir H Alavi
Represented By: Michael Dean McBride
Represented By: Joshua S Wyde
Represented By: Todd W Mensing
Represented By: Colin Baker Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH
Represented By: Megan Charlotte Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DynaEnergetics US, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Charlotte Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?