Rogers v. Kia Motors America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alisa McKenna Rogers
Defendant: Splashes Carwash and Lube Center, Kia Motors America, Inc., Splashes Car Wash, Inc doing business as Splashes Car Wash and Lube Center also known as Splashes of Silverlake and Splashes of Silverlake
Case Number: 3:2021cv00013
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Montpas, David)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time Motion due by 3/3/2021.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Alisa McKenna Rogers, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Chapman, Stephen)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion to Remand by Alisa McKenna Rogers, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chapman, Stephen)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kia Motors America, Inc., filed.(Montpas, David)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alisa McKenna Rogers, filed.(Chapman, Stephen)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Kia Motors America, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Montpas, David)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brazoria County District Court, case number 110455-CV (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25844443) filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit A-1, #5 Exhibit A-2, #6 Exhibit A-3, #7 Exhibit A-4, #8 Exhibit A-5, #9 Exhibit A-6, #10 Exhibit A-7, #11 Exhibit A-8, #12 Exhibit A-9, #13 Exhibit B, #14 Exhibit C)(Montpas, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Kia Motors America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa McKenna Rogers
Represented By: Joseph E Ritch
Represented By: Stephen J Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Splashes Carwash and Lube Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: David R Montpas
Represented By: Daniela Gonzales Aldape
Represented By: David M Prichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Splashes Car Wash, Inc doing business as Splashes Car Wash and Lube Center also known as Splashes of Silverlake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Splashes of Silverlake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?