K Investments, Inc. v. B-Gas Limited A/K/A Bepalo LPG Shipping Limited et al
Plaintiff: K Investments, Inc., Sikousis Legacy Inc. and Bahla Beauty Inc.
Defendant: B-Gas AS, B-Gas Limited A/K/A Bepalo LPG Shipping Limited, Bergshav Shipping Ltd., Atle Bergshaven, B-Gas Holding Ltd., Bergshav Shipping AS, Bergshav Shipholding AS, Bergshav Invest AS and LPG Invest AS
Case Number: 3:2021cv00016
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Vacate, filed by Bahla Beauty Inc., K Investments, Inc., Sikousis Legacy Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christian Krohn-Hansen in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition, #2 Proposed Order)(Gaitas, George)
March 24, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary R. Cain on behalf of Bergshav Shipping AS, filed. (Cain, Zachary)
March 23, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bahla Beauty Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26)(Gaitas, George)
March 23, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sikousis Legacy Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26)(Gaitas, George)
March 23, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by K Investments, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by K Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27)(Gaitas, George)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
March 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Vacate by Bergshav Shipping AS, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Letourneau, Keith)
March 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Foreign Law Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 44.1 by Bergshav Shipping AS, filed. (Letourneau, Keith)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 3:21-cv-16 and Member Case No. 3:21-cv-17 and 3:21-cv-18; granting #12 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 3:21-cv-00016 and Member Case No. 3:21-cv-00017, 3:21-cv-00018 (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
February 2, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 3:21-cv-00016 and Member Case No. 3:21-cv-00017, 3:21-cv-00018 by Bergshav Shipping AS, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Letourneau, Keith)
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Letter of Undertaking as Security by Bergshav Shipping AS, filed. (Letourneau, Keith)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of Service Executed as to M/T Bergitta; IMO# 9336426; Call Sign: C6WM5 on 1/28/21 re: Release of Vessel, filed.(agould, 3)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Release of Vessel by K Investments, Inc., filed. (Chalos, Jonathan)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Letourneau, Douglas Shoemaker, Zachary R. Cain on behalf of Bergshav Shipping AS, filed. (Letourneau, Keith)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of Service Executed as to m/T Bergitta; IMO # 9336426; Call Sign: C6WM5 on 1/26/2021 re: Rule B Attachment, filed.(agould, 3)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Chalos on behalf of K Investments, Inc., filed. (Chalos, Jonathan)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Writ. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) (Attachments: #1 Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by K Investments, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Authorizing Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment, #2 Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment)(Gaitas, George)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by K Investments, Inc. identifying Stealthgas, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Gaitas, George)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against K Investments, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25861163) filed by K Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaitas, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K Investments, Inc. v. B-Gas Limited A/K/A Bepalo LPG Shipping Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B-Gas AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B-Gas Limited A/K/A Bepalo LPG Shipping Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bergshav Shipping Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atle Bergshaven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B-Gas Holding Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bergshav Shipping AS
Represented By: Keith Bernard Letourneau
Represented By: Zachary Ryan Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bergshav Shipholding AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bergshav Invest AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPG Invest AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K Investments, Inc.
Represented By: George A Gaitas
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sikousis Legacy Inc.
Represented By: George A Gaitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahla Beauty Inc.
Represented By: George A Gaitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?