Bahla Beauty Inc. v. B-Gas Limited A/K/A Bepalo LPG Shipping Limited et al
Plaintiff: Bahla Beauty Inc.
Defendant: B-Gas AS, B-Gas Limited A/K/A Bepalo LPG Shipping Limited, Bergshav Shipping Ltd., B-Gas Holding Ltd., Bergshav Shipping AS, Bergshav Shipholding AS and Atle Bergshaven
Case Number: 3:2021cv00017
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Letter of Undertaking as Security by Bergshav Shipping AS, filed. (Letourneau, Keith)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of Service Executed as to M/T Bergitta; IMO # 9336426; Call Sign; C6WM5 on 1/28/2021 re: Rule B Attachment, filed.(agould, 3)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of Service Executed as to M/T Bergitta; IMO # 9336426; Call Sign; C6WM5 on 1/28/21 re: release of Vessel, filed.(agould, 3)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Release of Vessel by Bahla Beauty Inc., filed. (Chalos, Jonathan)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Letourneau, Douglas Shoemaker, Zachary R. Cain on behalf of Bergshav Shipping AS, filed. (Letourneau, Keith)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Writ. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) (Attachments: #1 Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Chalos on behalf of Bahla Beauty Inc., filed. (Chalos, Jonathan)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Bahla Beauty Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Authorizing Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment, #2 Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment)(Gaitas, George)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bahla Beauty Inc. identifying Stealthgas, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Gaitas, George)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25866930) filed by Bahla Beauty Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaitas, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bahla Beauty Inc. v. B-Gas Limited A/K/A Bepalo LPG Shipping Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B-Gas AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B-Gas Limited A/K/A Bepalo LPG Shipping Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bergshav Shipping Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B-Gas Holding Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bergshav Shipping AS
Represented By: Keith Bernard Letourneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bergshav Shipholding AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atle Bergshaven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahla Beauty Inc.
Represented By: George A Gaitas
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?