T & L Elite, Inc. v F/V CAPTAIN MAGIC, her engines, tackle, appurtenances, etc., in rem. et al
Plaintiff: T & L Elite, Inc.
Defendant: Dieu Thi Le and F/V CAPTAIN MAGIC, her engines, tackle, appurtenances, etc., in rem
Case Number: 3:2021cv00062
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Minute entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison. Initial conference held on May 14, 2021. The court and parties conferred and the court set out a schedule for the case. The scheduling order will be entered separately. Appearances:Ken Tribuch and Eugene Wade Barr. (Court Reporter: L. Wells), filed. (wbostic, 4)
May 7, 2021 Filing 17 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by T & L Elite, Inc., filed.(Barr, Eugene)
May 4, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by T & L Elite, Inc., filed.(Barr, Eugene)
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dieu Thi Le, filed.(Piccolo, Frank)
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by F/V CAPTAIN MAGIC, her engines, tackle, appurtenances, etc., in rem, Dieu Thi Le, filed.(Piccolo, Frank)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of Service Executed as to F/V CAPTAIN MAGIC on 3/19/2021 re: Vessel Release, filed.(agould, 3)
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED RETURN of Service Executed as to F/V Capt Magic, et al in rem and Dieu Thi Le, In personam on 3/17/21 re: complaint/Order of Arrest, Warrant, filed.(ltrevino, 3)
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed.(agould, 3)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
March 17, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(agould, 3)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 WARRANT to Seize a Vessel issued (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison), filed. (wbostic, 4)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake E Bachtel on behalf of T & L Elite, Inc., filed. (Bachtel, Blake)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to T & L Elite, filed.(Barr, Eugene)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to T & L Elite, filed.(Barr, Eugene)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION Seizure by T & L Elite, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warrant to Seize, #2 Proposed Order Order to Seize)(Barr, Eugene)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against F/V CAPTAIN MAGIC, her engines, tackle, appurtenances in rem and Dieu Thi Le in personam (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26123679) filed by Royston T & L Elite, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barr, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T & L Elite, Inc. v F/V CAPTAIN MAGIC, her engines, tackle, appurtenances, etc., in rem. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dieu Thi Le
Represented By: Frank Anthony Piccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V CAPTAIN MAGIC, her engines, tackle, appurtenances, etc., in rem
Represented By: Frank Anthony Piccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T & L Elite, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene Wade Barr
Represented By: Blake Earl Bachtel
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?