Diamond Services Corporation v. TW Laquay Marine, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Diamond Services Corporation
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and TW Laquay Marine, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00078
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by TW Laquay Marine, LLC, filed.(Rhine, Eric)
May 24, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., #1 Complaint, ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., #1 Complaint by TW Laquay Marine, LLC, filed.(Rhine, Eric)
May 20, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY in Support of #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Cannon, Steven)
May 13, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Diamond Services Corporation. (Morse, Harry)
May 4, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Cannon, Steven)
May 4, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss ( Motion Docket Date 5/25/2021.) by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cannon, Steven)
May 3, 2021 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Diamond Services Corporation. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Diamond Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(ltrevino, 3)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
April 30, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Diamond Services Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Errata Proposed Pleading, #3 Errata Proposed Exhibit 1, #4 Errata Proposed Exhibit 2, #5 Errata Proposed Exhibit 3)(Morse, Harry)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Main Document 12 replaced on 4/29/2021) (wbostic, 4).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Harry Morse to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 5/24/2021.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by TW Laquay Marine, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rhine, Eric)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Diamond Services Corporation, filed.(Morse, Harry)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diamond Services Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Morse, Harry)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JessicaVillarreal, 3)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to TW Laquay Marine, LLC, filed.(Morse, Harry)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to TW Laquay Marine, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Errata)(Morse, Harry)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Harry Morse to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Diamond Services Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/19/2021. (Morse, Harry)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TW Laquay Marine, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26185760) filed by Diamond Services Corporation.(Morse, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Services Corporation v. TW Laquay Marine, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Services Corporation
Represented By: Harry Edson Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Steven Kyle Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TW Laquay Marine, LLC
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?