Town of Ayer v. Chemicals Incorporated
Plaintiff: Town of Ayer
Defendant: Chemicals Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2021cv00107
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference reset for 7/27/2021 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER regarding Initial Scheduling Conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Chemicals Incorporated. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MarySanchez, 3)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Chemicals Incorporated, filed.(Summy, Paul)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
May 17, 2021 Summons Not Issued as to Chemicals Incorporated due to these deficiencies: Case Number/Style do not match case. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(MarySanchez, 3)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Chemicals Incorporated, filed.(Summy, Paul)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chemicals Incorporated (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26443978) filed by Town of Ayer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Summy, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Town of Ayer v. Chemicals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemicals Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Ayer
Represented By: Paul Scott Summy
Represented By: Christina Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?