Peters v. Texas Department Of Criminal Justice et al
Plaintiff: Michael G Peters
Defendant: The State Of Texas and Texas Department Of Criminal Justice
Case Number: 3:2021cv00164
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Michael G. Peters re: Status of case. Sent Docket Sheet via regular mail., filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MarySanchez, 3)
July 29, 2021 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 21-40560 re: #7 Notice of Appeal, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #7 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Not Paid, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal) (JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit by Michael G Peters, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 21, 2021 Appeal Review Notes re: #7 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Not Paid. The appeal filing fee has not been paid, and appellant is a pro se litigant.No hearings were held in the case - no transcripts. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue by Michael G Peters, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Coverletter)(MarySanchez, 3)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Michael G. Peters, filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MarySanchez, 3)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL #2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case terminated on 7/9/2021 Email sent to Manager of Three Strikes List. (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (agould, 3)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Michael G Peters, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/15/2021. (agould, 3)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402) filed by Michael G Peters.(agould, 3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Texas Department Of Criminal Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State Of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department Of Criminal Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?