Parada v. Sandhill Shores Property Owners Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cecilia Parada
Defendant: Sandhill Shores Property Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00195
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cecilia Parada, filed.(Whitburn, Mark)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sandhill Shores Property Owners Association, Inc. served on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021, filed.(Whitburn, Mark)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 DOCKETED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD NO IMAGE ATTACHED
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKETED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD NO IMAGE ATTACHED
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sandhill Shores Property Owners Association, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26814772) filed by Cecilia Parada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitburn, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parada v. Sandhill Shores Property Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Parada
Represented By: Mark Stewart Whitburn
Represented By: Mitchell Katine
Represented By: Neil Hugh McLaurin, IV
Represented By: Sean Edward Pevsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandhill Shores Property Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?