Barmore et al v. City of Kemah
Plaintiff: Jerry Barmore and Mike Mericle
Defendant: City of Kemah
Case Number: 3:2021cv00226
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/8/2021 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 Corrected AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of Kemah filed by Jerry Barmore, Mike Mericle.(Stewart, Joe). Case was incorrectly filed as a Houston case (4:21cv2755) Modified on 8/25/2021 (rsmith, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barmore et al v. City of Kemah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Barmore
Represented By: Joe Steven Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Mericle
Represented By: Joe Steven Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kemah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?