Cunningham v. Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Jackie Cunningham
Defendant: Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00302
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Referring Judge: Andrew M Edison
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Motions referred to Andrew M Edison. by Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Grant, Ashlee)
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Knettel on behalf of Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC, filed. (Knettel, Paul)
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b) by Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grant, Ashlee)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jackie Cunningham, filed.(Schreiber, Richard)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC served on 11/1/2021, answer due 11/22/2021, filed.(Schreiber, Richard)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Schreiber on behalf of Jackie Cunningham, filed. (Schreiber, Richard)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR***ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Jackie Cunningham, filed. (Dunlap, Andrew)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27239660) filed by Jackie Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Cunningham
Represented By: Andrew Wells Dunlap
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Represented By: Richard Mark Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton-Ryker IT Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Ashlee Cassman Grant
Represented By: Paul M. Knettel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?