Rawls v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Quneshia Rawls
Defendant: CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00303
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Referring Judge: Andrew M Edison
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice and for Approval of Settlement Agreement Motions referred to Andrew M Edison. by Quneshia Rawls, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Clif Alexander, #2 Proposed Order)(Alexander, William)
December 15, 2021 Filing 15 SEALED EXHIBITS (Ex A - Settlement Agreement) re: #14 Joint MOTION for Leave to File to File Under Seal by Quneshia Rawls, filed. (Alexander, William)
December 15, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Leave to File to File Under SealMotions referred to Andrew M Edison. by Quneshia Rawls, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alexander, William)
November 10, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Quneshia Rawls, filed.(Alexander, William)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David Israel on behalf of Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., filed. (Barreca, Kevin)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin G. Barreca on behalf of Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., filed. (Barreca, Kevin)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. identifying Convergent Resources, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(White, Whitney)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., filed.(White, Whitney)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. served on 10/27/2021, answer due 12/27/2021, filed.(Alexander, William)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC., filed.(Alexander, William)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27253053) filed by Quneshia Rawls. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Quneshia Rawls Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawls v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quneshia Rawls
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Austin W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, INC.
Represented By: Whitney L White
Represented By: Kevin G Barreca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?