State of Texas v. Biden et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: STATE OF TEXAS
Defendant: President Joseph R. Biden, United States Office of Personnel Management, Kiran Ahuja, General Services Administration, Robin Carnahan, Office of Management and Budget, Shalanda Young, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Jeffrey Zents, National Aeronautics And Space Administration, Bill Nelson, United States Department Of Agriculture, Tom Vilsack, Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden and Jeffrey Zients
Amicus Curiae: American Medical Association
Case Number: 3:2021cv00309
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/10/2021. Case is stayed. Appearances: Daniel David Hu, Kristin Alyssa Taylor, Brad P Rosenberg, Madeline M McMahon, Lee Reeves, Christopher D. Hilton, Halie Elizabeth Daniels, Amy Snow Hilton.(Court Reporter: Laura Wells), filed.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
December 8, 2021 Filing 49 RESPONSE to #43 Notice (Other) , filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics And Space Administration, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Department Of Agriculture, United States Office of Personnel Management, Tom Vilsack, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Gutierrez Decl., #2 Exhibit 2, Duff Decl., #3 Exhibit 3, Best Decl., #4 Exhibit 4, Brown Decl., #5 Exhibit 5, Novatnak Decl., #6 Exhibit 6, Garcia Decl.)(Taylor, Kristin) Modified on 12/8/2021 (GeorgeCardenas, 4).
December 8, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 12/10/2021 at 10:30 AM in by telephone before Judge Jeffrey V Brown, filed. (GeorgeCardenas, 4)
December 7, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: #6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by State Of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Daniels, Halie)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Jeffrey Dubner to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Jo Ann Kintz to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
December 7, 2021 Filing 44 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #41 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (lusmith, 3)
December 6, 2021 Filing 43 SUPPLEMENT to #6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by State Of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hilton, Christopher)
December 6, 2021 Filing 42 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kristin A Taylor for Transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing, December 3, 2021; Judge Brown. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Wells, filed. (Taylor, Kristin)
December 6, 2021 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT re: Telephonic Hearing held on December 3, 2021 before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura Wells. Ordering Party Ms. Kristin Alyssa Taylor Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2022., filed. (lwells, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by State Of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hilton, Christopher)
December 1, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION for JoAnn Kintz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by American Medical Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/22/2021. (ltrevino, 3)
December 1, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Setting re: #6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2021 at 10:00 AM in by telephone before Judge Jeffrey V Brown, filed. (GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 29, 2021 Filing 36 REPLY in Support of #6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by State Of Texas. (Hilton, Christopher)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 22, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Jeffrey Dubner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by American Medical Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2021. (ltrevino, 3)
November 22, 2021 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics And Space Administration, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Department Of Agriculture, United States Office of Personnel Management, Tom Vilsack, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Baughman Decl., #2 Exhibit Liu Decl., #3 Exhibit Summers Decl., #4 Exhibit Westlake Decl., #5 Exhibit Jackson Decl., #6 Exhibit Lopez Decl., #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Lopez Decl., #8 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Kristin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Anne Morton on behalf of American Medical Association, filed. (Morton, Jessica)
November 22, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel L. Fried on behalf of American Medical Association, filed. (Fried, Rachel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by American Medical Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amicus Brief)(Fried, Rachel)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Lee Reeves to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Madeline M. McMahon to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Jessica Morton to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Rachel Fried to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Brad P. Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 21, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Lee Reeves II on behalf of Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics And Space Administration, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Department Of Agriculture, United States Office of Personnel Management, Tom Vilsack, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. (Taylor, Kristin)
November 21, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline M. McMahon on behalf of Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics And Space Administration, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Department Of Agriculture, United States Office of Personnel Management, Tom Vilsack, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. (Taylor, Kristin)
November 21, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for C. Lee Reeves II to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics And Space Administration, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Department Of Agriculture, United States Office of Personnel Management, Tom Vilsack, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2021. (Taylor, Kristin)
November 21, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Madeline M. McMahon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics And Space Administration, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Department Of Agriculture, Tom Vilsack, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2021. (Taylor, Kristin)
November 19, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Jessica Morton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by American Medical Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2021. (ltrevino, 3)
November 19, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Rachel Fried to Appear Pro Hac Vice by American Medical Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/10/2021. (ltrevino, 3)
November 18, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #18 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (lusmith, 3)
November 17, 2021 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT re: Hearing on Motion held on November 16, 2021 before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. Court Reporter/Transcriber Laura Wells. Ordering Party Mr. Daniel Hu Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2022., filed. (lwells, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 17 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Daniel D. Hu for Transcript of Motion Hearing,11/16/2021, Judge Brown. Daily (24 hours) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Wells, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
November 17, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad P. Rosenberg on behalf of Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics And Space Administration, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Department Of Agriculture, United States Office of Personnel Management, Tom Vilsack, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
November 17, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Brad P. Rosenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics And Space Administration, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Department Of Agriculture, United States Office of Personnel Management, Tom Vilsack, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/8/2021. (Hu, Daniel)
November 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A Taylor on behalf of Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics And Space Administration, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Department Of Agriculture, United States Office of Personnel Management, Tom Vilsack, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. (Taylor, Kristin)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Kristin A. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER re: #6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed.(Daniels, Halie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Additional Agency Action re: #6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by State Of Texas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Daniels, Halie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Kristin A. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics And Space Administration, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Department Of Agriculture, United States Office of Personnel Management, Tom Vilsack, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/7/2021. (Taylor, Kristin)
November 16, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. MOTION HEARING held on 11/16/2021. Taken under advisement. Brief due by 11/22/2021. Reply soon after. Appearances:Brad Rosenburg. Daniel David Hu, Kristin Alyssa Taylor, Christopher D. Hilton, Halie Elizabeth Daniels, Amy Snow Hilton.(Court Reporter: Laura Wells), filed.(GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by State Of Texas, filed.(Hilton, Amy)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Hu on behalf of Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council, General Services Administration, National Aeronautics And Space Administration, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Department Of Agriculture, United States Office of Personnel Management, Tom Vilsack, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Setting re: #6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2021 at 02:00 PM in by telephone before Judge Jeffrey V Brown, filed. (GeorgeCardenas, 4)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by State Of Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-S, #2 Proposed Order)(Daniels, Halie)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement, #7 Supplement, #8 Supplement, #9 Supplement, #10 Supplement, #11 Supplement, #12 Supplement, #13 Supplement, #14 Supplement)(Hilton, Christopher)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, US Attorney's Office, and US Attorney General. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons_Biden 2, #2 Supplement Summons_Biden 3, #3 Supplement Summons_OPM 1, #4 Supplement Summons_OPM 2, #5 Supplement Summons_OPM 3, #6 Supplement Summons_Ahuja 1, #7 Supplement Summons_Ahuja 2, #8 Supplement Summons_Ahuja 3, #9 Supplement Summons_GSA 1, #10 Supplement Summons_GSA 2, #11 Supplement Summons_GSA 3, #12 Supplement Summons_Carnahan 1, #13 Supplement Summons_Carnahan 2, #14 Supplement Summons_Carnahan 3, #15 Supplement Summons_OMB 1, #16 Supplement Summons_OMB 2, #17 Supplement Summons_OMB 3, #18 Supplement Summons_Young 1, #19 Supplement Summons_Young 2, #20 Supplement Summons_Young 3, #21 Supplement Summons_SFWTF 1, #22 Supplement Summons_SFWTF 2, #23 Supplement Summons_SFWTF 3, #24 Supplement Summons_Zients 1, #25 Supplement Summons_Zients 2, #26 Supplement Summons_Zients 3, #27 Supplement Summons_NASA 1, #28 Supplement Summons_NASA 2, #29 Supplement Summons_NASA 3, #30 Supplement Summons_Nelson 1, #31 Supplement Summons_Nelson 2, #32 Supplement Summons_Nelson 3, #33 Supplement Summons_Dept of Ag 1, #34 Supplement Summons_Dept of Ag 2, #35 Supplement Summons_Dept of Ag 3, #36 Supplement Summons_Vilsack 1, #37 Supplement Summons_Vilsack 2, #38 Supplement Summons_Vilsack 3, #39 Supplement Summons_FAR 1, #40 Supplement Summons_FAR 2, #41 Supplement Summons_FAR 3, #42 Supplement Summons_Austin 1, #43 Supplement Summons_Austin 2, #44 Supplement Summons_Austin 3)(Hilton, Christopher)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/23/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27273811) filed by STATE OF TEXAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-E)(Hilton, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Texas v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Christopher D. Hilton
Represented By: Amy Snow Hilton
Represented By: Halie Elizabeth Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Joseph R. Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of Personnel Management
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiran Ahuja
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Services Administration
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Carnahan
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Management and Budget
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalanda Young
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safer Federal Workforce Task Force
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Zents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Aeronautics And Space Administration
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Nelson
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department Of Agriculture
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Acquisitions Regulation Council
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd J. Austin, III
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Lee Reeves
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Zients
Represented By: Brad P Rosenberg
Represented By: Madeline M McMahon
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Represented By: Kristin Alyssa Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Jeffrey Dubner
Represented By: Jessica Morton
Represented By: JoAnn Kintz
Represented By: Rachel Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?