Lewis v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Roy Lewis
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00067
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Roy Lewis, filed.(McNamara, John)
March 9, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 2/25/2022, answer due 4/26/2022, filed.(McNamara, John)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/1/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27797473) filed by Roy Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNamara, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Lewis
Represented By: John Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?