Harvey v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: Steven Harvey
Defendant: Dwight D Sullivan, Mark Henry, Darrell Apffel, Joe Giusti, Stephen Holmes, Robin Armstrong and Stephen D. Holmes
Case Number: 3:2022cv00337
Filed: September 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 12/6/2022 re: 17 Document(s) Sent, filed. (CynthiaBenavides, 3)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion, denying without prejudice #14 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #12 MOTION to Dismiss . CASE REMANDED TO 56TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT. Case terminated on 12/2/2022. (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(VanesaAranda, 3)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Certificate of Service in a Removed Action by Darrell Apffel, Robin Armstrong, Joe Giusti, Mark Henry, Stephen D. Holmes, Dwight D Sullivan, filed.(Lasswell, Bryan)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Steven Harvey, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harvey, Steven)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Second AMENDED PETITION against All Defendants filed by Steven Harvey. Related document: #5 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed by Steven Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Harvey, Steven)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Darrell Apffel, Robin Armstrong, Joe Giusti, Mark Henry, Stephen D. Holmes, Dwight D Sullivan, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2)(Lasswell, Bryan)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Conference by Steven Harvey, filed.(VanesaAranda, 3)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Petitioner's REPLY to #9 Brief, filed by Steven Harvey. (VanesaAranda, 3)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BRIEF Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re: #4 Response by Darrell Apffel, Robin Armstrong, Joe Giusti, Mark Henry, Stephen D. Holmes, Dwight D Sullivan, filed.(Lasswell, Bryan)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion For Permission to File Electronically.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(rcastro, 3)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Conference by Steven Harvey, filed.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION For Permission to File Electronically by Steven Harvey, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 First AMENDED PETITION for Declaratory Judgment and Emergency Relief Against Electronic Voting Systems and Destruction of Records against All Defendants filed by Steven Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Steven Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Darrell Apffel, Robin Armstrong, Joe Giusti, Mark Henry, Stephen D. Holmes, Dwight D Sullivan, filed.(Lasswell, Bryan)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/4/2023 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 56th Judicial District Court of Galveston County, Texas, case number 22-CV-1495 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28774084) filed by Dwight D Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 6, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 7)(Lasswell, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight D Sullivan
Represented By: Bryan Robert Lasswell
Represented By: Genevieve Bacak McGarvey
Represented By: John Wallace Drewry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Henry
Represented By: Bryan Robert Lasswell
Represented By: Genevieve Bacak McGarvey
Represented By: John Wallace Drewry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Apffel
Represented By: Bryan Robert Lasswell
Represented By: Genevieve Bacak McGarvey
Represented By: John Wallace Drewry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Giusti
Represented By: Bryan Robert Lasswell
Represented By: Genevieve Bacak McGarvey
Represented By: John Wallace Drewry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Armstrong
Represented By: Bryan Robert Lasswell
Represented By: Genevieve Bacak McGarvey
Represented By: John Wallace Drewry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Holmes
Represented By: Genevieve Bacak McGarvey
Represented By: John Wallace Drewry, Jr
Represented By: Bryan Robert Lasswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?