Harmon et al v. Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, LLC et al
Petitioner: Charles Harmon, Brian Coble, David Lawrence and Shell Provident Fund 401(k) Plan
Respondent: Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, LLC and Fidelity Management and Research, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022mc00002
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
January 28, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF RELATED LITIGATION by Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, LLC, Fidelity Management and Research, LLC, filed. (Reed, Noelle)
January 28, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Noelle M. Reed on behalf of Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, LLC, Fidelity Management and Research, LLC, filed. (Reed, Noelle)
January 27, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Matthew E. Layden to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Coble, Charles Harmon, David Lawrence, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Support of Pro Hac Vice)(Tramuto, Robert)
January 27, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Joel D. Rohlf to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Coble, Charles Harmon, David Lawrence, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Support of Pro Hac Vice)(Tramuto, Robert)
January 27, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Tramuto on behalf of Brian Coble, Charles Harmon, David Lawrence, filed. (Tramuto, Robert)
January 21, 2022 Filing 15 Docketed in error. ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/22/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison( Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4) Modified on 1/28/2022 (ltien, 4).
January 21, 2022 Filing 14 Case transferred in from Massachusetts. Case Number 1:22-mc-91017; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
January 20, 2022 Filing 13 Case transferred to the Southern District of Texas. Electronic file with documents numbered 1-12, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 15, 2022 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion to Transfer Case, there being no opposition and denying #1 Motion to Compel without prejudice to being renewed in the Southern District of Texas upon the transfer of the case. (Bowler, Marianne)
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Carroll on behalf of Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, LLC, Fidelity Management and Research, LLC (Carroll, James)
January 14, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 Assented to MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Texas. filed by Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, LLC, Fidelity Management and Research, LLC. (Douglass, Alison)
January 14, 2022 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Texas. by Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, LLC, Fidelity Management and Research, LLC.(Douglass, Alison)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, LLC, Fidelity Management and Research, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity Management and Research, LLC for Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, LLC.. (Douglass, Alison)
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison V. Douglass on behalf of Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, LLC, Fidelity Management and Research, LLC (Douglass, Alison)
January 13, 2022 Filing 5 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Full Pretrial and RR on any dispositive motions.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) Motions referred to Marianne B. Bowler.
January 13, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES as to #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1 MOTION to Compel by Petitioner Brian Coble. Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AMADC-9134409. Payment Type : MBD INITIATING DOCUMENT. (Naumes, Christopher)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Brian Coble. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Affidavit Joel D. Rohlf)(Naumes, Christopher)
January 11, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel by Brian Coble.(Naumes, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon et al v. Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Harmon
Represented By: Christopher C. Naumes
Represented By: Robert M Tramuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Coble
Represented By: Christopher C. Naumes
Represented By: Robert M Tramuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Lawrence
Represented By: Christopher C. Naumes
Represented By: Robert M Tramuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shell Provident Fund 401(k) Plan
Represented By: Christopher C. Naumes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fidelity Investments Institutional Operations Company, LLC
Represented By: James R Carroll
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Represented By: Alison V Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fidelity Management and Research, LLC
Represented By: James R Carroll
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Represented By: Alison V Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?