Yellen et al v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: Grale P DeKneef, Dustin I DeKneef, Mike Yellen, Shelby Hosana, Christy Kharisma Albinson, Devon Bowes and Sarah Bowes
Defendant: Governor Josh Green, Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Janes/John Does 1-1000 Employees for (FEMA), United States Military, Arm Forces, Alejandro Mayorkas, Joe Biden, Federal Aviation Administration (FAA), Kamala Harris, Lloyd Austin, III, Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for the FBI, Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employess for Department of Defense, Mandy Cohen, Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA), Antony Blinken, Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employess for Federal Aviation Administration, Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for Center for Disease Control Prevention, Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for (WHO), Jane/John Does 1-10000 Employees for US environmental Protection Agency, Merrick Garland, Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for Department of Justice, United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA), Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for United States Food and Drug Administration, Federal Communications Commission, Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for Federal Communications Commission, United States Senate, United States House of Representatives, National Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases, Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employess of National Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases, Alaska Airline, American Airline, Delta Airlines, Hawaiian Airlines, Southwest Airlines, United Airlines, Go Mokulele Airlines, UPS Airlines, WestJet Airlines, Japan Airlines, Air Canada, US Airways, Virgin American, Southern Airways, Pfizer Inc, Project Veritas, Johnson & Johnson, Merck & Co., Inc., Moderna, American Medical Association, State of Hawaii, Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for State of Hawaii, Richard T Bissen, Jr, Mitch Roth, Derek Kawakami, Rick Blangiardi, David Ige, Department of Land and Natural Resources, State of Hawaii, (DLNR), Board of Land and Natural Resources, State of Hawaii (BLNR), Hawaii State Department of Educational Board, Jane/John Does 1-1000 Are Civilains and/or Enlisted Personal for United States Military, Armed Forces, Air Force, Navy, Marines, Army, Space Force, United States Military, Rochelle Walensky, World Health Organization (WHO), US Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), Anthony Fauci, FedEx Express, Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for Department of Land and Natural Resources, State of Hawaii, Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for Hawaii State Department of Educational Board and Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Case Number: 3:2024cv00297
Filed: October 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 1/16/2025..(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (GeorgeCardenas, 3)
December 13, 2024 Filing 52 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Johnson & Johnson served on 12/5/2024, answer due 12/26/2024; Merck & Co., Inc. served on 12/5/2024, answer due 12/26/2024; Moderna served on 12/5/2024, answer due 12/26/2024; Pfizer Inc served on 12/5/2024, answer due 12/26/2024; World Health Oganization (WHO) served on 12/5/2024, answer due 12/26/2024, filed. (agg3)
December 12, 2024 Filing 51 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2025. (agg3)
December 12, 2024 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Additional Defendants American Airlines, Inc. and US Airways, Inc. To Respond to the Complaint by American Airline, US Airways, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kimbell, James)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 1/16/2025..(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (GeorgeCardenas, 3)
December 11, 2024 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Moving Defendants To Respond to the Complaint by Alaska Airline, Delta Airlines, Hawaiian Airlines, Southwest Airlines, United Airlines, FedEx Express, Virgin American, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kimbell, James)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #42 Motion.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (GeorgeCardenas, 3)
December 10, 2024 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time Time to Respond to Complaint by Mitch Roth, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/31/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Amended Unopposed Motion Extending Defendant Mitch Roth, Mayor Hawaii's Time to Respond to Complaint Until January 16, 2025) (Lee, Justin)
December 10, 2024 Filing 45 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/31/2024. (agg3)
December 10, 2024 Filing 44 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/31/2024. (agg3)
December 10, 2024 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to the Complaint by Go Mokulele Airlines, Air Canada, Southern Airways, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/31/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kimbell, James)
December 10, 2024 Filing 42 MOTION Motion and Order for Pro Hac Vice of M. Roy Goldberg by Go Mokulele Airlines, Southern Airways, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/31/2024. (Kimbell, James)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii. (Transfer of this case is stayed for 21 days pursuant to General Order 2024-02.) Out of Circuit Transfer Deadline set for 12/31/2024. (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (va3)
December 9, 2024 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time Time to Respond to Complaint by Mitch Roth, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion Extending Defendant Mitch Roth, Mayor Hawaii's Time to Respond to Complaint Until December 19, 2024) (Lee, Justin)
December 9, 2024 Filing 39 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2024. (agg3)
December 6, 2024 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #18 Response, filed by Mitch Roth. (agg3)
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (agg3)
December 5, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' November 3, 2024 Letter [Dkt 18] by Mitch Roth, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin C. Lee, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lee, Justin)
December 3, 2024 Filing 34 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Richard T Bissen, Jr served on 11/19/2024, answer due 12/10/2024; Rick Blangiardi served on 11/19/2024, answer due 12/10/2024; Derek Kawakami served on 11/19/2024, answer due 12/10/2024; Mitch Roth served on 11/19/2024, answer due 12/10/2024, filed. (agg3)
December 3, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/24/2024. (agg3)
December 2, 2024 Filing 32 MOTION for Joinder by Justin Charles Leslie, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (va3)
December 2, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION for Joinder by Joshua M. Gandy, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (va3) Modified on 12/2/2024 (va3).
December 2, 2024 Filing 30 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Air Canada served on 11/27/2024, answer due 12/18/2024; FedEx Express served on 11/26/2024, answer due 12/17/2024; Go Mokulele Airlines served on 11/26/2024, answer due 12/17/2024; Hawaiian Airlines served on 11/26/2024, answer due 12/17/2024; US Airways served on 11/26/2024, answer due 12/17/2024; WestJet Airlines served on 11/26/2024, answer due 12/17/2024, filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (va3)
December 2, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION for Joinder by Sophia Xenia Hart, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (va3)
November 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Justin C Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (GeorgeCardenas, 3)
November 26, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Justin Lee (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number ATXSDC-32551085) by Mitch Roth, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/17/2024. (Lee, Justin)
November 26, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE TO THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY GENERAL AND ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF HAWAII WITH WAIVER OF THE SERVICE OF SUMMONS by Mike Yellen, filed. (agg3)
November 25, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2024. (agg3)
November 18, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION for Joinder by Joshua Dukes, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/9/2024. (va3)
November 15, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/6/2024. (agg3)
November 12, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2024. (agg3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2024: #1 Supplement) (agg3).
November 12, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2024. (agg3)
November 12, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2024. (agg3)
November 12, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2024. (agg3)
November 12, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #7 Order, filed by Mike Yellen. (agg3)
November 6, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Joinder by Caren Mongeau, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (va3) (Main Document 17 replaced on 11/6/2024) (va3).
November 6, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Joinder by Holly Sheldon-Lee, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (va3) (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/6/2024) (va3).
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion. (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (va3)
November 6, 2024 Summons Not Issued as to United States Military, Arm Forces, Project veritas, National Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases, and U.S. Attorney for SDTX, summonses for these parties were never prepared by plaintiff. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed. (agg3)
November 6, 2024 Summons Issued as to Air Canada, Alaska Airline, American Airline, American Medical Association, Lloyd Austin, III, Joe Biden, Richard T Bissen, Jr, Rick Blangiardi, Antony Blinken, Board of Land and Natural Resources, State of Hawaii (BLNR), Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC), Mandy Cohen, Delta Airlines, Department of Land and Natural Resources, State of Hawaii, (DLNR), Anthony Fauci, FedEx Express, Federal Aviation Administration (FAA), Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), Federal Communications Commission, Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA), Merrick Garland, Go Mokulele Airlines, Governor Josh Green, Kamala Harris, Hawaii State Department of Educational Board, Hawaiian Airlines, David Ige, Japan Airlines, Johnson & Johnson, Derek Kawakami, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merck & Co., Inc., Moderna, Pfizer Inc, Mitch Roth, Southern Airways, Southwest Airlines, State of Hawaii, UPS Airlines, US Airways, US Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), United Airlines, United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA), United States House of Representatives, United States Military, United States Senate, Virgin American, Rochelle Walensky, WestJet Airlines, World Health Oganization (WHO). Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed. (agg3)
November 5, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Joinder by Bilal Ahmad Gassi, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (va3)
November 5, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Electronic Filing by Mike Yellen, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/26/2024. (va3)
November 5, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Permanent Injunction by Mike Yellen, filed. (va3)
November 5, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Permanent Injunction by Mike Yellen, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (va3)
November 5, 2024 Filing fee: $405.00, receipt number 300000297, filed. (va3)
October 31, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/21/2024. (agg3)
October 31, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/21/2024. (agg3)
October 29, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Joinder, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/19/2024. (agg3)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 15 ORDER (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (GeorgeCardenas, 3)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (agg3)
October 18, 2024 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Initial Conference set for 2/12/2025 at 09:00 AM is CANCELED. Parties notified, filed. (rrc3)
October 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/12/2025 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (va3)
October 16, 2024 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (va3)
October 16, 2024 Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (va3)
October 15, 2024 Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE of Filing Fee Due for filing of a case. Parties notified, filed. (agg3)
October 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Dustin I DeKneef, Christy Kharisma Albinson, Mike Yellen, Devon Bowes, Shelby Hosana, Sarah Bowes, Grale P DeKneef. (agg3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2024: #1 Supplement Summonses) (agg3). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2024: #2 Supplement Summonses) (agg3).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellen et al v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Josh Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janes/John Does 1-1000 Employees for (FEMA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Military, Arm Forces
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration (FAA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Austin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for the FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employess for Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employess for Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for Center for Disease Control Prevention
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for (WHO)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-10000 Employees for US environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for United States Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Communications Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for Federal Communications Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Senate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States House of Representatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employess of National Institute of Allergy and Infectious Diseases
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airline
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airline
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Airlines
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Airlines
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Mokulele Airlines
Represented By: M Roy Goldberg
Represented By: M Roy Goldberg
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WestJet Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Japan Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Canada
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Airways
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin American
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Airways
Represented By: M Roy Goldberg
Represented By: M Roy Goldberg
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Veritas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moderna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard T Bissen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Roth
Represented By: Justin C Lee
Represented By: Justin C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Kawakami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Blangiardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Land and Natural Resources, State of Hawaii, (DLNR)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Land and Natural Resources, State of Hawaii (BLNR)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii State Department of Educational Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Are Civilains and/or Enlisted Personal for United States Military, Armed Forces, Air Force, Navy, Marines, Army, Space Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Military
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Walensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Health Organization (WHO)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Fauci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Express
Represented By: James M Kimbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for Department of Land and Natural Resources, State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does 1-1000 Employees for Hawaii State Department of Educational Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grale P DeKneef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin I DeKneef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Yellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Hosana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Kharisma Albinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Bowes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Bowes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?