Karacostas v. Lindie Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gina Karacostas
Defendant: Lindie Services, Inc., Lindie Inc., Lindie Advanced Material Technologies, Inc, Linde Material Handling GmbH and Kion North America Corporation
Case Number: 3:2024cv00314
Filed: October 29, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Referring Judge: Andrew M Edison
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2024 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Linde Material Handling GmbH served on 12/11/2024, answer due 1/2/2025, filed. (Dills, William)
December 13, 2024 Filing 15 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Kion North America Corporation served on 12/11/2024, answer due 1/2/2025, filed. (Dills, William)
December 4, 2024 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Linde Material Handling GmbH. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (agg3)
December 4, 2024 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Kion North America Corporation. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (agg3)
December 3, 2024 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Linde Material Handling GmbH, Kion North America Corporation filed by Gina Karacostas. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Dills, William)
November 19, 2024 Filing 11 Rule 11 Agreement - Defendants Answer to Jan. 27, 2025 by Lindie Inc., Lindie Services, Inc., Lindie Advanced Material Technologies, Inc, filed. (Bridger, John)
November 14, 2024 Filing 10 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lindie Services, Inc. served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024, filed. (Dills, William)
November 14, 2024 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lindie Inc. served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024, filed. (Dills, William)
November 14, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Lindie Advanced Material Technologies, Inc served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024, filed. (Dills, William)
November 5, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gina Karacostas, filed. (Dills, William)
October 30, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Lindie Inc., Lindie Services, Inc., Lindie Advanced Material Technologies, Inc. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (va3)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (va3)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/12/2025 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (va3)
October 30, 2024 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (va3)
October 30, 2024 Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (va3)
October 29, 2024 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment Summons Reques, #2 Unredacted attachment Summons Reques) (Dills, William)
October 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lindie Advanced Material Technologies, Inc (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32407010) filed by Gina Karacostas. (Dills, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karacostas v. Lindie Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindie Services, Inc.
Represented By: John Wesley Bridger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindie Inc.
Represented By: John Wesley Bridger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindie Advanced Material Technologies, Inc
Represented By: John Wesley Bridger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linde Material Handling GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kion North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Karacostas
Represented By: William Walter Dills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?