Keeble v. Symetra Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Emily Keeble
Defendant: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2025cv00030
Filed: February 6, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2025 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Initial Conference set for 5/14/2025 at 09:00 AM is CANCELED. Parties notified, filed. (rrc3)
February 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison recused. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (agg3)
February 11, 2025 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Symetra Life Insurance Company served on 2/10/2025, answer due 4/11/2025, filed. (Svetlik, Erin)
February 7, 2025 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Symetra Life Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (vp3)
February 7, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Referral of Case to Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison. Parties notified, filed. (vp3)
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/14/2025 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified. (vp3)
February 7, 2025 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (vp3)
February 7, 2025 Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison selected to receive referrals. An order or notice of referral of case or motion to follow. (vp3)
February 6, 2025 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Emily Keeble, filed. (Valdez, Selina)
February 6, 2025 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Emily Keeble, filed. (Valdez, Selina)
February 6, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Symetra Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32882079) filed by Emily Keeble. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Valdez, Selina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keeble v. Symetra Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Keeble
Represented By: Selina Renae Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?