C&E Pharmacy et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Farmacia De Medica, Central Pharmacy, C&E Pharmacy, Cedric Washington, Farmacia De Pueblo and Edreka Sheppard
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Drug Enforcement Administration, SAJ Distributors, Bellcro Health, Cardinal Distribution and United States of America
Case Number: 4:2008cv03759
Filed: December 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2009 Filing 48 FINAL DISMISSAL on #47 Stipulation of Dismissal. Case terminated on 6/1/2009.(Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(kcarr, )
May 30, 2009 Filing 47 STIPULATION of Dismissal by C&E Pharmacy, Central Pharmacy, Farmacia De Medica, filed.(Roberts, Jennie)
March 12, 2009 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, Drug Enforcement Administration, filed.(Longoria, Samuel)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER renaming first named defendant DEA to United States of America.(by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(dkelly, )
March 12, 2009 *** Party name Cardinal Health corrected to Cardinal Distribution, filed. (dkelly, )
March 11, 2009 Filing 45 Interlocutory DISMISSAL. Cardinal Distribution; SAJ Distributors; Edreka Sheppard; Cedric Washington; AmerisourceBergen Corporation and Bellcro Health dismissed and terminated re: #11 , #13 , #17 , #34 , #41 . The case is stayed until 6/1/2009. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(dkelly, )
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER on Substitution. By consent of the parties, Cardinal Distribution is substituted for Cardinal Health, and it appeared. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(dkelly, )
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM: Appearances: Matthew Caligur, Landon Jones, Charles Thomas Kruse, Samuel G Longoria, Craig D Mills, Jennie Marie Roberts. Ct Reporter: M. Malone. This case is stayed. Order to be entered. Review (Internal Use Only): 6/8/2009. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(dkelly, )
March 8, 2009 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in support of Amended Motion to Dismiss re: #41 AMENDED #13 MOTION by Cardinal Health, filed.(Kruse, Charles)
March 8, 2009 Filing 41 AMENDED #13 MOTION by Cardinal Health, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2009. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kruse, Charles)
March 8, 2009 Filing 40 Second RESPONSE to #34 MOTION to Dismiss #25 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed by C&E Pharmacy, Central Pharmacy, Farmacia De Medica, Farmacia De Pueblo, Edreka Sheppard, Cedric Washington. (Roberts, Jennie)
March 8, 2009 Filing 39 Second RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by C&E Pharmacy, Central Pharmacy, Farmacia De Medica, Farmacia De Pueblo, Edreka Sheppard, Cedric Washington. (Roberts, Jennie)
March 8, 2009 Filing 38 Second REPLY to Response to #21 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendant for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by C&E Pharmacy, Central Pharmacy, Farmacia De Medica, Farmacia De Pueblo, Edreka Sheppard, Cedric Washington. (Roberts, Jennie)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Substitute Craig D. Mills as attorney-in-charge. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(dkelly, )
March 4, 2009 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney-in-Charge by Bellcro Health, Bello Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/24/2009. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mills, Craig)
March 3, 2009 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re: #34 MOTION to Dismiss #25 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Bellcro Health, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, filed.(Jones, Landon)
March 3, 2009 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss #25 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Bellcro Health, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/23/2009. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Landon)
March 2, 2009 Filing 33 REPLY to Plaintiffs' Response to Federal Defendant's Motion tio Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by Drug Enforcement Administration, Drug Enforcement Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Longoria, Samuel)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Resetting Conference. Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 3/9/2009 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified. (dkelly, )
February 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian J. Laliberte.(Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(kcarr, )
February 24, 2009 Filing 30 MOTION for Brian J. Laliberte to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cardinal Health, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/16/2009. (Kruse, Charles)
February 17, 2009 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by C&E Pharmacy, Central Pharmacy, Farmacia De Medica, Farmacia De Pueblo, Edreka Sheppard, Cedric Washington. (Roberts, Jennie)
February 17, 2009 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition to #17 MOTION Joinder in Defendant AmerisourceBergen Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss, filed by C&E Pharmacy, Central Pharmacy, Farmacia De Medica, Farmacia De Pueblo, Edreka Sheppard, Cedric Washington. (Roberts, Jennie)
February 17, 2009 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by C&E Pharmacy, Central Pharmacy, Farmacia De Medica, Farmacia De Pueblo, Edreka Sheppard, Cedric Washington. (Roberts, Jennie)
February 17, 2009 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition to #21 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendant for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by C&E Pharmacy, Central Pharmacy, Farmacia De Medica, Farmacia De Pueblo, Edreka Sheppard, Cedric Washington. (Roberts, Jennie)
February 17, 2009 Filing 25 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants filed by C&E Pharmacy, Central Pharmacy, Farmacia De Medica, Farmacia De Pueblo, Edreka Sheppard, Cedric Washington.(Roberts, Jennie)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Thomas L. Long to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(sbyrum, )
February 11, 2009 Filing 23 MOTION for Thomas L. Long to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cardinal Health, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/3/2009. (Kruse, Charles)
February 6, 2009 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Federal Defendant for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed.(Longoria, Samuel)
February 6, 2009 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendant for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Drug Enforcement Administration, Drug Enforcement Administration, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Longoria, Samuel)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Craig Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(sbyrum, )
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Landon Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(sbyrum, )
February 2, 2009 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bellcro Health identifying Liberty Acquisition Company and AmerisourceBergen Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Fibbe, George)
February 2, 2009 Filing 17 MOTION Joinder in Defendant AmerisourceBergen Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss by Bellcro Health, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/23/2009. (Fibbe, George)
February 2, 2009 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, filed.(Fibbe, George)
February 2, 2009 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, filed.(Kruse, Charles)
February 2, 2009 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss by Cardinal Health, filed.(Kruse, Charles)
February 2, 2009 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Cardinal Health, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/23/2009. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kruse, Charles)
February 2, 2009 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, filed.(Fibbe, George)
February 2, 2009 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/23/2009. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fibbe, George)
January 30, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION for Landon Y. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2009. (pjameson, )
January 30, 2009 Filing 9 MOTION for Craig D. Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2009. (jewilliams, )
January 30, 2009 Summons Issued as to Drug Enforcement Administration, filed.(jewilliams, )
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 3/23/2009 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes.(Signed by Judge Lynn N. Hughes) Parties notified.(dkelly, )
December 30, 2008 CIVIL Filing fee re: #1 Complaint : $350.00, receipt number 4-597719, filed. (ejones, )Paid by Jennie Marie Roberts, Atty.
December 29, 2008 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to SAJ Distributors, filed.(jewilliams, )
December 29, 2008 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Drug Enforcement Administration, filed.(jewilliams, )
December 29, 2008 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Drug Enforcement Administration, filed.(jewilliams, )
December 29, 2008 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cardinal Health, filed.(jewilliams, )
December 29, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, filed.(jewilliams, )
December 29, 2008 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bellcro Health, filed.(jewilliams, )
December 29, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350) filed by C&E Pharmacy, Central Pharmacy, Farmacia De Medica, Farmacia De Pueblo, Edreka Sheppard, Cedric Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Check)(jewilliams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C&E Pharmacy et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Craig D Mills
Represented By: Landon Y Jones
Represented By: George Harold Fibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: Samuel G Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellcro Health
Represented By: Craig D Mills
Represented By: Landon Y Jones
Represented By: George Harold Fibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Distribution
Represented By: Thomas L Long
Represented By: Charles Thomas Kruse
Represented By: Brian J Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel G Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmacia De Medica
Represented By: Jennie Marie Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Pharmacy
Represented By: Jennie Marie Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C&E Pharmacy
Represented By: Jennie Marie Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Washington
Represented By: Jennie Marie Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmacia De Pueblo
Represented By: Jennie Marie Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edreka Sheppard
Represented By: Jennie Marie Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?