Young Again Products, Inc v. Acord et al
Plaintiff: Young Again Products, Inc
Defendant: John Acord and Marcella Ortega
Case Number: 4:2009mc00282
Filed: June 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER entered GRANTING 191 MOTION to Enforce This Court's Order of Contempt and Sanctions Against Sean Ortega Issued on April 21, 2014 as to 186 Order. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER entered: This court finds and concludes that the plaintiff's motion for contempt be granted, in part, and sanctions imposed. John Acord's motion to dismiss the motion for contempt is denied and his objections to the Memorandum and Recommendation are overruled as meritless.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER entered GRANTING IN PART 173 MOTION for Extension of Time Filiing Exceptions and Objections to the Judge Magistrate's Memorandum and Findings of March 5th, 2013. His objections must be filed by March 29, 2013. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER entered GRANTING 122 MOTION for Joe Alfred Izen, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Gilmartin is added for Deft. John Acord. Mr. Gilmartin must file his notice of apperance by 11/30/12. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER entered setting hearing: Show Cause Hearing set for 10/1/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. Defendants must file any written response by 9/24/12. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AGREED JUDGMENT entered. Case terminated on 4/6/10.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER entered. A hearing will be held on 11/17/09, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11-B to hear argument on YAP's motion for preliminary injunction..(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER entered RESETTING HEARING. Evidentiary Hearing reset for 11/9/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER entered GRANTING Pltfs. 20 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. A hearing will be held on October 5, 2009, at 8:30, in Courtroom 11-B.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young Again Products, Inc v. Acord et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Young Again Products, Inc
Represented By: Margaret Maxwell McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Acord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcella Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?