Mabary v. HomeTown Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Lisa Mabary
Defendant: HomeTown Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2010cv03936
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 88:8888
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 14 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss For Want of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, DENYING 8 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
November 22, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 13 MOTION to Certify Class.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
August 30, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 43 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss 12 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. or Stay Proceedings (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)
March 18, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sloewe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mabary v. HomeTown Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Mabary
Represented By: Emil Lippe, Jr
Represented By: Ronald Bruce Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeTown Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William Frank Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.