DAC Surgical Partners P.A. v. United Healthcare Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Lake Breeze Surgical Affiliates, P.A., Surgery Pro P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, LSO Curgery Center, PA, South Side ENT, P.A., LSO Surgery Center, P.A. and Comprehensive Surgicare Center, LLC
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc. and Ingenix, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Euston Associates, PLLC and Par Surgical, PLLC
Counter Defendant: Ned S Holmes, Scott A Cohen, M.D. Kenneth G. Berliner, D.P.M. Chad C. Clause, D.P.M. Stephen G. Eichelsdorfer, M.D. Richard Garza, D.P.M. Markus Giacomuzzi, D.P.M. David S. Jenson, M.D. Ahmed Khalifa, D.P.M. Elizabeth A. Kroborth-Lyon, D.P.M. Bryan Yueh Lee, M.D. James H. Liu, M.D. Eugene Lou, M.D. Rafael A. Lugo, M.D. Michael C. Maier, D.P.M. Gabriel Maislos, D.P.M. Gregory L. Mangum, D.P.M. Jerry Miles, M.D. Bruce Miller, D.P.M. Robert J. Moore, III, M.D. Robert A. Moore, Jr., D.P.M. Mark H. Moss, D.P.M. Sherman Nagler, D.P.M. Meynard M. Nussbaum, D.P.M. Jeffrey J. Penso, D.P.M. D. Sean Sweeney, M.D. Steven D. Thompson, D.P.M. Marco Vargas, M.D. Richard M. Westmark, D.P.M. Brian W. Zale, M.D. Larry P. Conrad, M.D. Alfredo Jimenez, M.D. Roy S. Lewis, M.D. Becky McGraw-Wall, M.D. Cong Thu Nguyen, M.D. Mark A. Nichols and M.D. Kevin R. Smith
3Rd Party Plaintiff: The Palladium for Surgery-Houston, LP
Case Number: 4:2011cv01355
Filed: April 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION for Tyler G. Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Palladium for Surgery-Houston, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2012. (mlothmann)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE AND DIRECITEC TO CONFER Setting Hearing on Motion #70 Opposed MOTION to Quash Defendants' Subpoena : Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F. Atlas.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Opposed MOTION to Quash Defendants' Subpoena by Ivan Wood, Jr, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/30/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Garber, Katherine)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Third AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. filed by AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Surgery Pro P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A..(Dumesnil, Bryan)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by The Palladium for Surgery-Houston, LP.(Waggoner, Justin)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Intervene by The Palladium for Surgery-Houston, LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/16/2012. (Waggoner, Justin)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time Amended Pleadings due by 2/29/2012.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline To Add Parties by AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Surgery Pro P.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/21/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dumesnil, Bryan)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTED #63 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings, Including to File Counterclaims ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/2/2012, including the assertion of counterclaims.).(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings, Including to File Counterclaims by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chejfec, Charles)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(kgilyard, )
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Kathy L. Kottos to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ingenix, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/4/2012. (Chejfec, Charles)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,, by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed.(Chejfec, Charles)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Defendants Motion for Clarification [Doc. # 44] isGRANTED as set forth herein, and Defendants Motion for Reconsideration [Doc.# 44] is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY In Support of Motion For Clarification and/or Reconsideration of the Court's Order Dated August 30, 2011, filed by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chejfec, Charles)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition to #44 MOTION for Clarification as to #43 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike,, MOTION for Clarification as to #43 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike,, MOTION for Reconsideration, filed by AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Surgery Pro P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dumesnil, Bryan)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Linda Rovira. This is to order a transcript of Motion Hearing held on 9-14-2011 before Judge Nancy F. Atlas, filed. (kgilyard, ) Modified on 9/29/2011 (dclark, ). Daily copy order electronically forwarded to Digital Scroll Transcription 9/29/2011. Deposit check put in regular mail.
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion For Copy Of Sealed Transcript by AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Surgery Pro P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/14/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dumesnil, Bryan)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SUPPLEMENT to #44 MOTION for Clarification as to #43 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike,, MOTION for Clarification as to #43 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike,, MOTION for Reconsideration by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chejfec, Charles)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #51 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (kcraig, )
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT re: Initial Conference held on 9/14/2011 before Judge Nancy F. Atlas. Court Reporter/Transcriber Digital Scroll Transcription. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2011., filed. (lgriffin, )
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 15 days. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2012 Pltf Expert Report due by 6/1/2012 Deft Expert Report due by 7/1/2012 Discovery due by 8/31/2012. Mediation due by 5/1/2012 Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/12/2012. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/12/2012. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/16/2013. Docket Call set for 1/24/2013 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F. Atlas.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Jesse Coleman. This is to order a transcript of Motion Hearing held on 9/14/2011 before Judge Nancy F. Atlas (Original). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Digital Scroll Transcription, filed. Daily order electronically forwarded to Digital Scroll Transcription 9/15/2011. (dclark, )
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Pretrial conference held Appearances: Bryan Dumesnil for Plaintiff, Lane Cruz/Kathy Josephson for Defendant. Ct Reporter: ERO..Docket control order to follow.Defendant to file their supplemental briefing to their Motion for Clarification within one (1) week. Plaintiff may file any response within two (2) weeks after the filing of the supplemental briefing. Defendants reply will be due within one (1) week after the filing of the response.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Corrected AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by FSS-Houston Foot P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., Surgery Pro P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics.(Dumesnil, Bryan)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 First AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by FSS-Houston Foot P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., Surgery Pro P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics.(Dumesnil, Bryan)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Ingenix, Inc., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Surgery Pro P.A., United Healthcare Services, Inc., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A., filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Clarification as to #43 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike,, ( Motion Docket Date 9/30/2011.), MOTION for Reconsideration by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Chejfec, Charles)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #33 Motion to Strike and granting in part and denying in part #20 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint by 9/19/11.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(TDR)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SURREPLY to #33 MOTION to Strike Exhibits Attached To Motion To Dismiss, filed by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chejfec, Charles)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Defendants have filed a Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 20] and Plaintiffs have filed a corresponding Motion to Strike Exhibits Attached to Defendants Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 37]. Because these two motions will not be decided by the current initial pretrial conference on August 29, 2011, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial pretrial and scheduling conference is rescheduled to September 14, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. Initial Conference set for 9/14/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F. Atlas.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY in Support of #33 MOTION to Strike Exhibits Attached To Motion To Dismiss, filed by AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Surgery Pro P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A.. (Dumesnil, Bryan)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(arrivera, )
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Seal Exhibit 1 to Doc #34.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(arrivera, )
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE to #33 MOTION to Strike Exhibits Attached To Motion To Dismiss filed by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chejfec, Charles)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Supplemental OBJECTIONS to #33 MOTION to Strike Exhibits Attached To Motion To Dismiss, filed by AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Surgery Pro P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A.. (Dumesnil, Bryan)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/19/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chejfec, Charles)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY in Support of #20 MOTION to Dismiss #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,, filed by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service)(Chejfec, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2011: #5 Exhibit 1 - Redacted) (mrios, ).
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Strike Exhibits Attached To Motion To Dismiss by AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Surgery Pro P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dumesnil, Bryan)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition to #20 MOTION to Dismiss #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, MOTION to Dismiss #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,,, filed by AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Surgery Pro P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Dumesnil, Bryan)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECLARATION of Dr. Gregory L. Mangum re: #30 Surreply to Motion,,,,, filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SURREPLY to #19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay, filed by AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Surgery Pro P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dumesnil, Bryan)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY in Support of #19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay, filed by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Coleman, Jesse)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference is rescheduled for 8/29/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F. Atlas.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE to #19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay filed by AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Surgery Pro P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dumesnil, Bryan)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 7/18/2011.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Submission Deadline by AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics, Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Surgery Pro P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Dumesnil, Bryan)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(saustin, )
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Seal.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Kathleen M. Flannery to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2011. (Chejfec, Charles)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit 2 of Defendants Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration As to Certain Plaintiffs by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Jesse)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,,,,, by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/5/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Coleman, Jesse)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration( Motion Docket Date 7/5/2011.), MOTION to Stay by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Coleman, Jesse)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTED #17 MOTION for Emily K Davis to Withdraw as Attorney, Attorney Emily Davis terminated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Emily K Davis to Withdraw as Attorney by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order)(Davis, Emily)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by DAC Surgical Partners P.A., filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED Amended Complaint with Jury Demand against Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. filed by FSS-Houston Foot P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Aspen Surgical Center P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Surgery Pro P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Gator Surgical, P.A., JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A., Elite Surgical Center, P.A., AMS Surgical Center, P.A., Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A., KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A., Irish Surgical Center, P.A., RDJ Surgical Center, P.A., Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A., Alex Surgical Center, P.A., Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A., CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A., Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A., Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P., Clear Lake ENT, P.A., Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics.(Dumesnil, Bryan)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTED #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead ; Answer due for Ingenix, Inc. 6/1/2011; United Healthcare Services, Inc. 6/1/2011.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, )
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/20/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chejfec, Charles)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Emily Davis.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(clamey, )
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles Chejfec.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(clamey, )
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kathy P. Josephson.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(clamey, )
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed.(Chejfec, Charles)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Charles Chejfec to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/17/2011. (Chejfec, Charles)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Emily K. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/17/2011. (Josephson, Kathy)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Kathy P. Josephson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/17/2011. (Josephson, Kathy)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Aspen Surgical Center P.A., Cadenza Specialty Care P.A., DAC Surgical Partners P.A., FSS-Houston Foot P.A., Fairway Surgical Center P.A., Good Feet Surgery P.A., Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Lake Breeze SUrgical Affiliates P.A., Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A., Maislos Podiatry P.A., Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A., Premier Surgical Group P.A., Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A., Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., SJS Surgery P.A., SSPA Surgical Center P.A., Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A., Surgery Pro P.A., Wellness Surgical Associates P.A., filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ingenix, Inc. served on 4/11/2011, answer due 5/2/2011, filed.(kettac, )
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to United Healthcare Services, Inc. served on 4/11/2011, answer due 5/2/2011, filed.(kettac, )
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/25/2011 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F. Atlas.(Signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Parties notified.(lfilmore, )
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-7921346) filed by DAC Surgical Partners P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dumesnil, Bryan)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Ingenix, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed.(emathis, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAC Surgical Partners P.A. v. United Healthcare Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAC Surgical Partners P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wellness Surgical Associates P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Professional Foot and Ankle Surgical Center P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSPA Surgical Center P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Breeze Surgical Affiliates, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surgery Pro P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maislos Podiatry P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hopestar Foot and Ankle Surgery Center P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cadenza Specialty Care P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Good Feet Surgery P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Surgical Group P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FSS-Houston Foot P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manzano Surgical Affiliates P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMN Enterprise Surgery Center P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairway Surgical Center P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SJS Surgery P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Surgical Center P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redbird Foot & Ankle Surgery Center P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gator Surgical, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JMB Surgical Affiliates, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Surgical Center, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMS Surgical Center, P.A.
Represented By: Robert J Axelrod
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonestar Surgery Center, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KLA Foot & Ankle Surgical Center, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irish Surgical Center, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RDJ Surgical Center, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ankle and Foot Surg Excel, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Surgical Center, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Surgical Affiliates, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CC Houston Surgical Center, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galleria Surgical Associates, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starboard Specialty Care, L.L.P.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clear Lake ENT, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth G. Berliner, M.D., P.A. d/b/a/ Lonestar Orthopedics
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LSO Curgery Center, PA
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Side ENT, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LSO Surgery Center, P.A.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comprehensive Surgicare Center, LLC
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Euston Associates, PLLC
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Represented By: Edward P Watt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Par Surgical, PLLC
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Represented By: Robert J Bozelli
Represented By: Edward P Watt
Represented By: Scott R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Carin Halverson
Represented By: John T Lepore
Represented By: Peter J Shakow
Represented By: Charles Chejfec
Represented By: Emily Davis
Represented By: Jesse Coleman
Represented By: Kathleen M. Flannery
Represented By: Kathleen A Kelley
Represented By: Kathy P Josephson
Represented By: Kathy L. Kottos
Represented By: Kevin William Yankowsky
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingenix, Inc.
Represented By: John T Lepore
Represented By: Andrea Carin Halverson
Represented By: Charles Chejfec
Represented By: Emily Davis
Represented By: Jesse Coleman
Represented By: Kathleen M. Flannery
Represented By: Kathleen A Kelley
Represented By: Kathy P Josephson
Represented By: Kathy L. Kottos
Represented By: Kevin William Yankowsky
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ned S Holmes
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Scott A Cohen
Represented By: A Kent Altsuler
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Represented By: Charles Scott Nichols
Represented By: Edward P Watt
Represented By: Laura Reilly O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Kenneth G. Berliner
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Chad C. Clause
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Stephen G. Eichelsdorfer
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Richard Garza
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Markus Giacomuzzi
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. David S. Jenson
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Ahmed Khalifa
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Elizabeth A. Kroborth-Lyon
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Bryan Yueh Lee
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. James H. Liu
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Eugene Lou
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Rafael A. Lugo
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Michael C. Maier
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Gabriel Maislos
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Gregory L. Mangum
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Jerry Miles
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Bruce Miller
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Robert J. Moore, III
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Robert A. Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Mark H. Moss
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Sherman Nagler
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Meynard M. Nussbaum
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Jeffrey J. Penso
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. D. Sean Sweeney
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Steven D. Thompson
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Marco Vargas
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Richard M. Westmark
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: D.P.M. Brian W. Zale
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Larry P. Conrad
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Alfredo Jimenez
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Roy S. Lewis
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Becky McGraw-Wall
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Cong Thu Nguyen
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Mark A. Nichols
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: M.D. Kevin R. Smith
Represented By: Bryan S Dumesnil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: The Palladium for Surgery-Houston, LP
Represented By: Justin McKenzie Waggoner
Represented By: Tyler G Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?