Alfaro et al V City of Houston et al
Plaintiff: Edith Alfaro, Jane Doe One, Jane Doe Two and Jane Doe Three
Defendant: City of Houston and Abraham Joseph
Case Number: 4:2011cv01541
Filed: April 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 FINAL JUDGMENT entered. Case terminated on 7/9/13.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER entered DENYING as MOOT 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Petition (DE 1-12).(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER entered: The parties have filed an agreed motion for a protective order. (Docket Entry No. 21). Paragraph 9 on page 3 of the proposed order must be revised to reflect that under the case law, a higher good-cause showing is required to file do cuments under seal with the court than to designate them as confidential when they are exchanged in discovery. The paragraph must be revised to state that when documents designated as confidential are filed with the court, they may initially be file d under seal but will not be maintained under seal unless the party designating them as confidential files a motion to do so. Such a motion must be filed 7 days after the filing, must show good cause for sealing the documents, and must state whether the opposing party contests filing the documents under seal. The parties may file a revised agreed protective order no later than September 30, 2011.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfaro et al V City of Houston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Houston
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Alfaro
Represented By: Katrina S Patrick
Represented By: Marjorie A Murphy
Represented By: Benjamin L Hall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe One
Represented By: Katrina S Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe Two
Represented By: Katrina S Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe Three
Represented By: Katrina S Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?