Night Owl Games, LP Featured Case
Plaintiff: Night Owl Games, LP
Defendant: Zynga, Inc. and Zynga Game Network Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv04062
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 3/19/2012.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(jewilliams, )
March 16, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Defendants by Night Owl Games, LP, filed. (Barnes, Stephen)
March 13, 2012 Summons Issued as to Zynga Game Network Inc., Zynga, Inc., filed.(glyons)
March 12, 2012 Summons Issued as to Zynga Game Network Inc., Zynga, Inc., filed.(glyons)
December 13, 2011 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Night Owl Games, LP, filed.(Barnes, Stephen)
November 23, 2011 Filing 3 Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed.(bdaniel, )
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/23/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(lfilmore, )
November 18, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zynga, Inc., Zynga Game Network Inc. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-8909374) filed by Night Owl Games, LP.(Barnes, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Night Owl Games, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Night Owl Games, LP
Represented By: Stephen Anthony Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zynga, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zynga Game Network Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?