Hyder v. Morgan Garris Consulting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Eric Hyder
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation, Morgan Garris Consulting, LLC and Administaff Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv00220
Filed: January 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 10/9/2012. Deadline to reinstate: within 30 days from the date of this order. (Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
October 3, 2012 Filing 11 Alternative Dispute Resolution Questionnaire mailed to all parties of record, filed. (dmullinax, )
October 1, 2012 Filing 10 Alternative Dispute Resolution Memorandum; case settled, filed.(sguevara, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2012: #1 cover letter) (sguevara, ).
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 3-4 days. Jury trial. ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2012, Joinder of Parties due by 4/30/2012, Pltf Expert Report due by 7/6/2012, Deft Expert Report due by 9/6/2012, Discovery due by 10/19/2012, Mediation due by 11/15/2012, Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/30/2012, Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/30/2012, Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/8/2013, Objections to exhibits/witnesses due 2/15/2013, Docket Call set for 2/22/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9D before Judge Gray H. Miller).(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny)
April 27, 2012 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Administaff Companies, Inc., Cameron International Corporation, Charles Eric Hyder, Morgan Garris Consulting, LLC, filed.(Herring, Danielle)
March 6, 2012 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cameron International Corporation, filed.(Tipton, Drew)
March 6, 2012 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cameron International Corporation, filed.(Tipton, Drew)
March 5, 2012 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Administaff Companies, Inc., Morgan Garris Consulting, LLC, filed.(Herring, Danielle)
March 5, 2012 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Administaff Companies, Inc., Morgan Garris Consulting, LLC, filed.(Herring, Danielle)
January 30, 2012 Summons Issued as to Administaff Companies, Inc., Cameron International Corporation, Morgan Garris Consulting, LLC, filed.(lfilmore, )
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 5/9/2012.(Signed by Judge Gray H. Miller) Parties notified.(aboyd)
January 24, 2012 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Charles Eric Hyder, filed.(Simon, Kell)
January 24, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-9153398) filed by Charles Eric Hyder. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simon, Kell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyder v. Morgan Garris Consulting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation
Represented By: Drew B Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Garris Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Danielle K. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administaff Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle K. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Eric Hyder
Represented By: Kell Ascher Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?