Tempest Publishing, Inc. v. Hacienda Records and Recording Studio, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tempest Publishing, Inc.
Defendant: Hacienda Records and Recording Studio, Inc., Hacienda Records, L.P., Latin American Entertainment, LLC, Annie Garcia, Rick Garcia, Roland Garcia and Gilbert Garcia
Case Number: 4:2012cv00736
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Fort Bend
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: The court denies Hacienda's motion for award of costs, (Docket Entry No. 132), denies Tempest's amended motion for award of costs, (Docket Entry No. 138), and grants in part and denies in part Tempest's m otion for award of costs, (Docket Entry No. 131). Tempest is entitled to recover $5,208.25 for necessary transcripts and $10,194.45 for necessary printing and copying, for a total of $15,402.70. The costs are reduced by 50 percent, for a total of $7,701.35. Hacienda must pay Tempest this amount no later than December 4, 2015. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED. Case terminated on 3/18/15.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER entered: The court construes those emails as a motion to strike Haciendas proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law from the docket and denies the motion. Tempest is free to file its own proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law but should not in any way feel compelled to do so. Tempest, like Hacienda, has thoroughly explained the findings and conclusions it would like this court to make, given the evidence and the law. No additional or repeated presentation is required. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER entered: The court will consider the reply brief filed in this case. A brief response, limited to the arguments and evidence raised for the first time in the reply, may be filed no later than Monday, September 23, 2013.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER entered: The pretrial conference set for September 16, 2013 is cancelled. The parties joint pretrial order is due by October 1, 2013. The docket call remains set for October 4, 2013, at 10:00 a.m.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER entered: The parties have informed the court that they are having difficulty scheduling the deposition of Roman Martinez before the deadline for Hacienda's response to Tempest's supplement to its summary-judgment motion. Hacienda m ay depose Martinez on August 28, 2013, as the parties previously agreed. Hacienda's response brief will be due September 6, 2013. Docket call is rescheduled for October 4, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11-B. The joint proposed pretrial order will be due September 29, 2013.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER entered: For the reasons stated by the court in the April 8, 2013 hearing held in this case, the pretrial motions deadline is extended to May 30, 2013.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER entered: Hacienda Recordss request for a one-week extension to file its expert designation and report is granted. The new deadline is March 8, 2013. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER entered GRANTING 25 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw 17 Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER entered: Parties have until 11/30/12 to file a revised agreed protective order. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tempest Publishing, Inc. v. Hacienda Records and Recording Studio, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tempest Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua R Leal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hacienda Records and Recording Studio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hacienda Records, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latin American Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?