Martel V. EMC Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Joyce Martel
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp, Texas Windstorm Insurance Association and EMC Mortgage
Interested Party: John Steve Mostyn
Case Number: 4:2012cv01931
Filed: June 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Melinda Harmon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: #37 Stipulation of Dismissal. Case terminated on October 18, 2013(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rvazquez)
October 9, 2013 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by EMC Mortgage, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brooks, Treyson)
August 23, 2013 Filing 36 Letter from Treyson J. Brooks re: ruling on the M/S/J, filed. (sguevara, )
April 19, 2013 Disbursement of Registry Funds to Joyce Martel in the amount of $6,238.17 on 4/18/2013 re: #35 Financial Order (REGARDING REGISTRY FUNDS), filed. (knguyen, )
April 19, 2013 Disbursement of Registry Funds to Joyce Martel in the amount of $58,279.25 on 4/18/2013 re: #35 Financial Order (REGARDING REGISTRY FUNDS), filed. (knguyen, )
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #28 MOTION for Release of Funds (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rvazquez)
March 28, 2013 Filing 34 PROPOSED ORDER re: #28 MOTION for Release of Funds, filed.(Woods, Keith) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2013: #1 Proposed Order Reviewed by Finance) (knguyen, ).
March 26, 2013 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by American Strategic Insurance in the amount of $6237.89, receipt number HOU034804 re: #23 Financial Order (REGARDING REGISTRY FUNDS), filed. (thanniable, )
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying as moot #24 Motion to Quash Defendant's Subpoena Duces Tecum, Motion for Protection, Motion to Stay, Objections and Motion for Sanctions.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(gsalinas)
March 25, 2013 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to #27 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by EMC Mortgage. (Brooks, Treyson)
March 25, 2013 Filing 31 REPLY in Support of #24 MOTION to Quash Defendant's Subpoena Duces Tecum, Motion for Protection Regarding Subpoena Duces Tecum, Motion to Stay, Objections, and Motion for Sanctions, filed by John Steve Mostyn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Mostyn, John)
March 20, 2013 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #24 MOTION to Quash Defendant's Subpoena Duces Tecum, Motion for Protection Regarding Subpoena Duces Tecum, Motion to Stay, Objections, and Motion for Sanctions filed by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Order)(Beer, Barrie)
March 20, 2013 Filing 29 RESPONSE to #27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joyce Martel. (Woods, Keith)
March 20, 2013 Filing 28 MOTION for Release of Funds by Joyce Martel, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/10/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Woods, Keith) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2013: #2 Proposed Order Reviewed by Finance) (knguyen, ).
March 11, 2013 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by Texas Windstorm in the amount of $58276.71, receipt number 34390 re: #26 Financial Order (REGARDING REGISTRY FUNDS), filed. (ckrus, )
March 5, 2013 Filing 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EMC Mortgage, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brooks, Treyson)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Unopposed MOTION to Deposit Funds into the Registry of the Court, It is further ORDERED that TWIA, having deposited the undisputed policy proceeeds into the registry of this Court, is hereby DISMISSED from this action WITH PREJUDICE.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, )
February 28, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy re #24 MOTION to Quash Defendant's Subpoena Duces Tecum, Motion for Protection Regarding Subpoena Duces Tecum, Motion to Stay, Objections, and Motion for Sanctions, filed. (htippen, )
February 27, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION to Quash Defendant's Subpoena Duces Tecum, Motion for Protection Regarding Subpoena Duces Tecum, Motion to Stay, Objections, and Motion for Sanctions by John Steve Mostyn, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Mostyn, John)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 MOTION to Deposit Funds Into the Registry of the Court, It is further ORDERED that ASI, having deposited the undisputed policy proceeds into the registry of this Court is DISMISSED from this action WITH PREJUDICE at ASI's costs. American Strategic Insurance Corp terminated(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, )
February 12, 2013 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Deposit Funds into the Registry of the Court by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2013: #10 Proposed Order Reviewed by Finance) (knguyen, ).
February 8, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION to Deposit Funds Into the Registry of the Court by American Strategic Insurance Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Proposed Order)(Jones, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2013: #10 Proposed Order Reviewed by Finance) (knguyen, ).
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File. The joinder deadline is now 03/11/13. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, )
January 30, 2013 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Extend Joinder Deadline by Joyce Martel, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/20/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Woods, Keith)
January 16, 2013 Filing 18 DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Joyce Martel, filed.(Woods, Keith)
January 8, 2013 Filing 17 ADVISORY by Joyce Martel, filed.(Woods, Keith)
December 5, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Martin, Barrie J. Beer, Amber R. Dunten on behalf of Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, filed. (Martin, Christopher)
December 5, 2012 Filing 15 Request to Extend Joinder Deadline by Joyce Martel, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Woods, Keith)
October 15, 2012 Filing 14 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Salyer, David)
October 15, 2012 Filing 13 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Joyce Martel, filed.(Woods, Keith)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 12/7/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 12/7/2012 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 1/16/2013. Pltf Expert Report due by 1/16/2013. Deft Expert Witness List due by 2/13/2013. Deft Expert Report due by 2/13/2013. Discovery due by 3/31/2013. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/28/2013. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/28/2013. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/2/2013. Docket Call set for 11/1/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Melinda Harmon. Trial Term by 11/4/2013(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(bwhite, )
October 4, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 10/4/2012 ; docket control order to follow. Appearances:Chris King. Bradley K Jones, Treyson J Brooks, Keith Landis Woods.(Court Reporter: ERO)(Digital # 10:29 - 10:35)(ERO:M Lothmann), filed.(bwhite, )
September 24, 2012 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by American Strategic Insurance Corp, filed.(Jones, Bradley)
August 9, 2012 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, filed.(Salyer, David)
August 9, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Salyer on behalf of Texas Windstorm Insurance Association, filed. (Salyer, David)
August 1, 2012 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Joyce Martel, filed.(Woods, Keith)
July 19, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Aguda, Jr. on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corp, filed. (Aguda, Joseph)
June 29, 2012 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EMC Mortgage identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Brooks, Treyson)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/4/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ltien, )
June 27, 2012 Filing 4 EXHIBITS re: #1 Notice of Removal, by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed.(Jones, Bradley)
June 27, 2012 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed.(Jones, Bradley)
June 27, 2012 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Strategic Insurance Corp., filed.(Jones, Bradley)
June 27, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 80th Judicial Court of Harris County, case number 2012-22249 (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-9944631) filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jones, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martel V. EMC Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp
Represented By: Joseph J Aguda, Jr
Represented By: Bradley K Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Windstorm Insurance Association
Represented By: Christopher W Martin
Represented By: Christopher Claude King
Represented By: David P Salyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Treyson J Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John Steve Mostyn
Represented By: John Steven Mostyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Martel
Represented By: Keith Landis Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?