Tenacious, Ltd. v. Seaway Powell Marine Ltd. et al

Defendant: Seaway Powell Marine Ltd. and Precision Technology USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tenacious, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2013cv00436
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered GRANTING 13 Agreed MOTION to Abate. Case terminated on 10/10/13. The proceedings and deadlines in this case are abated until January 15, 2014, pending the mediation agreed to by the parties. During that period, this case will b e administratively closed. No later than January 15, 2014, if the case has not been resolved, the parties must file a motion to reinstate and appear for a status conference on January 17, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
January 10, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered GRANTING 16 Joint MOTION to Abate. Status Conference reset for 2/14/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 16, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF PENDING DISMISSAL entered: The appropriate motion must be filed by 6/24/13 or this case is subject to dismissal. The initial conference set for 5/31/13 is canceled. Deadlines terminated.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tenacious, Ltd. v. Seaway Powell Marine Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaway Powell Marine Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Technology USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenacious, Ltd.
Represented By: William Bruce Stanfill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.