Nall et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Michael Nall and Flora Nall
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company, National Carriers' Conference Committee, United Transportation Union and United Transportation Union Health and Welfare Committee
Case Number: 4:2014cv02819
Filed: October 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
County: Harris
Presiding Judge: Melinda Harmon
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 84 motion for leave to file; denying 85 motion for judgment on the pleadings. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 OPINION AND ORDER denying in part; granting in part 62 Plaintiffs' Objections to 60 BNSF Railway Company's Bill of Costs. It is hereby Ordered that Plaintiffs's Objections, is DENIED IN PART. Accordingly, BNSF's Bill of Costs is GRANTED with the exception of $148.00 in shipping and delivery fees. Accordingly, BNSF is entitled to recover 7,152.63 from Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 OPINION AND ORDER. Nall's Motion to Strike 40 is DENIED. Nall's Motion for Summary Judgment 38 is DENIED. BNSF's Motion for Summary Judgment 39 is GRANTED.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nall et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nall
Represented By: Nitin Sud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Nall
Represented By: Nitin Sud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Bryan Patrick Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Carriers' Conference Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Transportation Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Transportation Union Health and Welfare Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?